EP0587826 - METHOD OF FEEDING BULK MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ÖSTERREICHISCHE HOMOGENHOLTZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 7201 Neudörfl/Leitha / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states ÖSTERREICHISCHE HOMOGENHOLTZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT A-7201 Neudörfl/Leitha / AT | ||
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states ISOHOLDING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Elisabethstrasse 16 A-1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EPPLE, Albrecht Ursulastrasse 33 D-4700 Hamm 1 / DE | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Dungler, Karin Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Manfred Beer und Dipl.-Ing. Reinhard Hehenberger Postfach 264 1071 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/15] | Dungler, Karin Isovolta Österreich. Isolierstoffwerke AG Industriezentrum NÖ-Süd Isovoltastrasse 3 A-2355 Wiener Neudorf / AT | ||
Former [1994/19] | Stampfer, Heinz ISOVOLTA Österreichische Isolierstoffwerke AG, Patentabteilung, Industriezentrum NÖ-Süd A-2355 Wiener Neudorf / AT | Application number, filing date | 93901952.7 | 04.02.1993 | [1994/12] | WO1993AT00014 | Priority number, date | AT19920000186 | 04.02.1992 Original published format: AT 18692 | [1994/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9315262 | Date: | 05.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587826 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587826 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D21C7/06, D21C7/12 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
B01J3/02 (EP);
D21C7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/37] |
Former [1994/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | EINSPEISEVERFAHREN | [1994/12] | English: | METHOD OF FEEDING BULK MATERIALS | [1994/12] | French: | PROCEDE D'ALIMENTATION | [1994/12] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.11.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 08.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) MC, PT | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, GR, IE, LU | 02.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.01.1994 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.1994 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.1994 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.05.1996 | FR | 01.05.1996 | GB | 01.05.1996 | NL | 01.05.1996 | SE | 01.08.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | ES | 01.05.1996 | |
GB | 01.05.1996 | ||
NL | 01.05.1996 | ||
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
FR | 27.09.1996 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 01.05.1996 | |
GB | 01.05.1996 | ||
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
FR | 27.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | GB | 01.05.1996 | |
SE | 01.08.1996 | ||
FR | 27.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | SE | 01.08.1996 | |
FR | 27.09.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 01.08.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE861963 (EKSTROEMS MASKINAFFAER AB); | [X]DE940398 (PAPETERIES DE FRANCE); | [A]FR1222132 (PANDIA) |