EP0625086 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO CUTTING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rawson, Francis Frederick Hamilton Unit 15, Queniborough Industrial Estate, Melton Road Queniborough Leicestershire LE7 8FP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | For all designated states RAWSON, Francis Frederick Hamilton Unit 15, Queniborough Industrial Estate, Melton Road Queniborough, Leicester LE7 8PF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/47] | Representative(s) | Lally, William, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Lally, William, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/47] | Lally, William FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München 40 / DE | Application number, filing date | 93902457.6 | 25.01.1993 | [1994/47] | WO1993GB00159 | Priority number, date | GB19920001785 | 28.01.1992 Original published format: GB 9201785 | [1994/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9314912 | Date: | 05.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0625086 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0625086 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/08 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
B26D7/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/47] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an Ultraschallmesser | [1994/47] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO CUTTING DEVICES | [1994/47] | French: | PERFECTIONNEMENTS DES DISPOSITIFS DE DECOUPE | [1994/47] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.1994 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.04.1997 | LI | 02.04.1997 | [1998/15] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2504019 (JAUS & SOEHNE KARL, et al); | [A]GB2079213 (GERBER GARMENT TECHNOLOGY INC); | [A]GB2219245 (RAWSON FRANCIS F H, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 510 (M-1045)8 November 1990 |