EP0591539 - ROTARY COMPRESSOR IN WHICH BLADE AND ROLLER ARE INTEGRATED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYAMA, Toshiyuki, Rinkai-Kojo, Sakai-Seisakusho of Daikin Industries., Ltd. 12, Chikkou-Shinmachi 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 592 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Yasushi, Rinkai-Kojo, Sakai-Seisakusho of Daikin Industries, Ltd., 12, Chikkou-Shinmachi 3-cho, Sakai-shi Osaka 592 / JP | 03 /
UEMATSU, Takahiro, Rinkai-Kojo, Sakai-Seisakusho of Daikin Industries Ltd., 12, Chikkou-Shinmachi 3-cho, Sakai-shi, Osaka 592 / JP | 04 /
MASUDA, Masanori, Rinkai-Kojo, Sakai-Seisakusho of Daikin Industries Ltd. 12, Chikkou-Shinmachi 3 -cho, Sakai-shi, Osaka 592 / JP | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93902558.1 | 02.02.1993 | [1994/15] | WO1993JP00122 | Priority number, date | JP19920109939 | 28.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10993992 | JP19920252750 | 22.09.1992 Original published format: JP 25275092 | [1994/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322561 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591539 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591539 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/356 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
F04C18/322 (EP,US);
F01C21/0809 (EP,US);
F01C21/102 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/15] | Title | German: | ROTATIONSVERDICHTERKOLBEN MIT INTEGRIERTEN ZELLEN | [1994/15] | English: | ROTARY COMPRESSOR IN WHICH BLADE AND ROLLER ARE INTEGRATED | [1994/15] | French: | COMPRESSEUR ROTATIF A TENON ET TAMBOUR INTEGRES | [1994/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1993 | Translation filed | 24.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1993 | Search fee paid | 24.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 24.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2635553 (GORDINIER RALPH E) [X] 1,6 * column W * [Y] 2; | [Y]FR2184275 (GVANG MOTOR CO LTD [AU]) [Y] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]US3025801 (PETER PAIKERT HANS) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE457676 (JUSTUS BRAUN DIPL ING) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE471873 (LUDWIG GEB) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US3839995 (WILLIAMS R) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4836759 (LLOYD IAN [AU]); | [Y]JPS48113011U ; | [A]JPS63167095 (DAIKIN IND LTD) |