blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0627106

EP0627106 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ELECTRONIC IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.1997
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.11.1997 [1997/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RSO CORPORATION N.V.
Abraham de Veerstraat 7, P.O.Box 840
Curaçao / AN
[1994/49]
Inventor(s)01 / TYREN, Carl
12, boulevard Albert-1er
F-06600 Antibes / FR
02 / PERSSON, Leif, Arnold
Glasförgyllaren 51
S-245 00 Staffanstorp / SE
[1994/49]
Representative(s)Ström, Tore, et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [1994/49]Ström, Tore, et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188
S-203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date93902632.420.01.1993
[1994/49]
WO1993SE00038
Priority number, dateSE1992000014520.01.1992         Original published format: SE 9200145
SE1992000347918.11.1992         Original published format: SE 9203479
[1994/49]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9314474
Date:22.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0627106
Date:07.12.1994
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1994/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0627106
Date:27.11.1996
Language:EN
[1996/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE22.07.1993
ClassificationIPC:G07C11/00, H04B1/59, G01S13/75, G08B13/24
[1996/48]
CPC:
G08B13/2408 (EP,US); A01K11/006 (EP,US); G01B7/00 (EP,US);
G01B7/003 (EP,US); G01D5/14 (EP,US); G01V15/00 (EP,US);
G01V3/08 (EP,US); G06K7/0008 (EP,US); G06K7/10059 (EP,US);
G06K7/10336 (EP,US); G07C9/28 (EP,US); G08B13/2417 (EP,US);
G08B13/2431 (EP,US); G08B13/2442 (EP,US); G08B13/2474 (EP,US);
G08B13/2485 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1994/49]G07C11/00, H04B1/59, G01S13/80, G08B13/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1994/49]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTRONISCHEN IDENTIFIZIERUNG[1994/49]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ELECTRONIC IDENTIFICATION[1994/49]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'IDENTIFICATION ELECTRONIQUE[1994/49]
Entry into regional phase27.07.1993Translation filed 
30.07.1994National basic fee paid 
30.07.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.08.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.07.1994Examination requested  [1994/49]
24.04.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.05.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.1996Fee for grant paid
17.08.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO8801427  (TYREN CARL [SE], et al);
 [A]WO8901722  (ENGUVU AG [CH]);
 [XA]EP0338696  (SECURITY TAG SYSTEMS INC [US]);
 [A]WO9100494  (TYREN CARL [FR], et al);
 [A]WO9117515  (DISYS INC [CA])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.