EP0575597 - MULTI-TEST IMMUNOCHEMICAL REAGENT AND METHOD TO USE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DADE INTERNATIONAL INC. 1717 Deerfield Road, P.O. Box 778 Deerfield Illinois 60015-0778 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states DADE INTERNATIONAL INC. 1717 Deerfield Road , P.O. Box 778 Deerfield, Illinois 60015-0778 / US | ||
Former [1993/52] | For all designated states BAXTER DIAGNOSTICS INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOCHES, Francee 5550 N.W. 102 Place Miami, FL 33178 / US | 02 /
BROTHERTON, Mary 1007 N.W. 17th Court Miami, FL 33125 / US | 03 /
REGAN, Jeffrey 4025 N. Meridian Avenue Miami Beach, FL 33140 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Dennis 3739 Quinby Road San Jose, CA 95148 / US | 05 /
TIMMONS, Richard 10221 S.W. 84th Court Miami, FL 33156 / US | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | MacGregor, Gordon, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | MacGregor, Gordon, et al ERIC POTTER CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham, NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93902770.2 | 30.12.1992 | [1993/52] | WO1992US11230 | Priority number, date | US19920817138 | 06.01.1992 Original published format: US 817138 | [1993/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9314403 | Date: | 22.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575597 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/531, G01N33/543, G01N33/58 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
G01N33/543 (EP);
G01N33/54306 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/52] | Title | German: | MULTI-TEST IMMUNOCHEMISCHES REAGENZ UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG | [1993/52] | English: | MULTI-TEST IMMUNOCHEMICAL REAGENT AND METHOD TO USE SAME | [1993/52] | French: | REACTIF IMMUNOCHIMIQUE POUR ESSAIS MULTIPLES ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [1993/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 05.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/34] | 13.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9118291 ; | [X]US4205057 ; | [X]EP0188093 ; | [A]WO8808978 ; | [A]WO8905453 ; | [A]WO8202601 ; | [A]EP0122695 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 335 (P-632)(2782) 4 November 1987 |