EP0634989 - IMPROVED TRIGGER SPRAYER APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Sprayers International, Inc. 27 Gunther Boulevard St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | [1999/41] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states CONTICO INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED 1101 North Warson Road St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSTER, Donald, D. 2524 Trenton Station St. Charles, MO 63303 / US | 02 /
Laffey, Martin S. 7 East Crestview Drive O'Fallon, MO 63366 / US | 03 /
Nelson, Philip L. 2106 Clarkson Court Ellisville, MO 63011 / US | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Copp, David Christopher, et al Dummett Copp 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL Suffolk / GB | [2008/37] |
Former [1999/41] | Copp, David Christopher, et al Dummett Copp & Co. 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich Suffolk IP5 7SL / GB | ||
Former [1995/04] | Copp, David Christopher Dummett Copp & Co. 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich Suffolk IP5 7SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93902815.5 | 30.12.1992 | [1995/04] | WO1992US11296 | Priority number, date | US19920848706 | 09.03.1992 Original published format: US 848706 | [1995/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317956 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0634989 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0634989 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/40 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
B05B11/0008 (EP,US);
B05B11/0044 (EP,US);
B05B11/1011 (EP,US);
B05B11/1045 (EP,US);
B05B11/0062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/04] | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBER VOM TRIGGERTYP | [1995/04] | English: | IMPROVED TRIGGER SPRAYER APPARATUS | [1995/04] | French: | APPAREIL PULVERISATEUR A DECLENCHEUR AMELIORE | [1995/04] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/51: Teilanmeldung 97117359.6 eingereicht am 08/10/97 | EPB 1997/51: Divisional application 97117359.6 filed on 08/10/97 | EPB 1997/51: Demande divisionnaire 97117359.6 déposée le 08/10/97 | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1994 | Search fee paid | 12.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 07.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 29.10.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1999 | Observations by third parties | 31.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05021519.3 / EP1609530 | EP05021520.1 / EP1609531 | EP97117359.6 / EP0819475 | EP97117360.4 / EP0819476 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Request for further processing for: | 15.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2000 | Decision despatched | 23.03.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 01.04.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2001 | 31.12.2001 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   04.01.2002 | 31.12.2002 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4153203 (TADA TETSUYA [JP]) [AD] 9,12,13,35,39,40 * the whole document *; | [A]US4191313 (BLAKE WILLIAM S [US], et al) [A] 9,35 * column 5, line 31 - line 48; figure - *; | [A]EP0098508 (UNIVERSAL DISPENSING SYST [US]) [A] 9,35 * page 8, line 22 - page 9, line 6; figure - *; | [XA]US4454965 (KIRK JR DONALD C [US]) [X] 23,24 * column 6, line 41 - line 65; figure 1 * [A] 15,22; | [A]WO9003226 (AFA PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 9-14,35-41 * page 9, line 8 - line 20; figure - *; | [A]US4944431 (BLAKE WILLIAM S [US]) [A] 15,22* column 4, line 22 - line 34; figure - * | International search | [A]US2668642 (JOHANNESEN ALLAN N); | [X]EP0202380 (CANYON CORP [JP]); | [X]US4669664 (GARNEAU RICHARD P [US]); | [Y]US4944431 (BLAKE WILLIAM S [US]); | [XY]US4958754 (DENNIS STEPHEN R [US]); | [X]US4989790 (MARTIN DOUGLAS S [US], et al) | Examination | US4387817 | other | - "UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT", UNITED STATES DISTRIOT COURT, XX, XX, XX, (19991005), no. 187, pages 01 - 21, XP000889451 |