EP0624174 - SEMICARBAZIDE/URETHANE STABILIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNESSY, Michael, James 112 Strawberry Avenue Vineland, NJ 08360 / US | 02 /
SELLING, Gordon William 1509 Fir street Waynesboro, VA 22980 / US | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93902844.5 | 30.12.1992 | [1994/46] | WO1992US11331 | Priority number, date | US19920830329 | 31.01.1992 Original published format: US 830329 | [1994/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9315136 | Date: | 05.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0624174 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624174 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/26, C08K5/3472, D01F6/70, C07D249/08 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
D01F6/70 (KR);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/26 (KR);
C08K5/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/46] | Title | German: | SEMICARBAZID-URETHAN-STABILISATOR | [1996/38] | English: | SEMICARBAZIDE/URETHANE STABILIZER | [1994/46] | French: | STABILISATEUR AU SEMICARBAZIDE/URETHANE | [1994/46] |
Former [1994/46] | SEMICAREBAZID-URETHAN-STABILISATOR | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.1994 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/46] | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 18.09.1996 | FR | 18.09.1996 | GB | 30.12.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 18.09.1996 | |
GB | 30.12.1996 | ||
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | GB | 30.12.1996 | |
FR | 14.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | FR | 14.02.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3399167 (KARL ROSENDAHL FRIEDRICH, et al); | [A]US5028642 (GOODRICH CHARLES W [US], et al) |