EP0621784 - AN IRON-CONTAINING COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION OF ANAEMIA AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLM CHRISTENSEN, Borge Odinsvej 116 DK-3140 Aalsgaarde / DK | [1994/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/44] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 DK-1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 93903184.5 | 20.01.1993 | [1994/44] | WO1993DK00017 | Priority number, date | DK19920000064 | 20.01.1992 Original published format: DK 6492 | WO1992DK00384 | 17.12.1992 Original published format: PCT/DK92/00384 | [1994/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313783 | Date: | 22.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0621784 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621784 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/26 | [1994/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/5073 (EP);
A23K20/30 (EP);
A23K40/10 (EP);
A23K40/30 (EP);
A23K50/60 (EP);
A61K31/295 (EP);
A61K33/26 (EP);
A61K33/28 (EP);
A61K38/01 (EP);
A61K38/42 (EP);
A61K9/5089 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
B01F25/721 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/295, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/295, A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K33/26, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/28, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/28, A61K31/195 (EP);
A61K38/01, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/01, A61K33/28, A61K31/295 (EP);
A61K38/42, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/44] | Title | German: | EISENHALTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERHÜTUNG VON ANÄMIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1994/44] | English: | AN IRON-CONTAINING COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION OF ANAEMIA AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE COMPOSITION | [1994/44] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT DU FER SERVANT A LA PREVENTION DE L'ANEMIE ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1994/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/44] | 29.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.1997 | BE | 04.06.1997 | CH | 04.06.1997 | GR | 04.06.1997 | LI | 04.06.1997 | NL | 04.06.1997 | PT | 04.09.1997 | SE | 04.09.1997 | LU | 20.01.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
GR | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
NL | 04.06.1997 | ||
PT | 04.09.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
LU | 31.01.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
GR | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
PT | 04.09.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
LU | 31.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/24] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
PT | 04.09.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
CH | 04.06.1997 | ||
LI | 04.06.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
SE | 04.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
BE | 04.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 04.06.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP02083400 ; | [A]GB1409468 (SANOL ARZNEI SCHWARZ GMBH); | [A]GB1465781 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | [A]DK136101B (GEWERKSCHAFT VICTOR CHEM FABR [DE]); | [X]SE466287 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | [A] - Dialog Information Service, File 351, WPIL, Dialog Accession Nr. 00824871, WPI Accession No. 90-135712/18 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS), "Iron oasein prepn., useful in treatment of anaemia - by reacting"; & JP,A,02 083 400, publ. 900323., & JP02083400 A 00000000 |