EP0577812 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTION OF AIR BUBBLES IN TUBING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cobe Laboratories, Inc. 1185 Oak Street Lakewood CO 80215-4407 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | For all designated states COBE LABORATORIES, INC. 1185 Oak Street Lakewood CO 80215-4407 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HLAVINKA, Dennis, J. 7365 North Salvia Court Golden, CO 80403 / US | 02 /
LARSON, Byron, W. 449 Wright Stret, Apt. 204 Lakewood, CO 80228 / US | [1994/02] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1994/02] | Williams, Trevor John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93903624.0 | 19.01.1993 | [1994/02] | WO1993US00555 | Priority number, date | US19920825657 | 23.01.1992 Original published format: US 825657 | [1994/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9315397 | Date: | 05.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0577812 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/02 | [1994/02] | CPC: |
A61M1/3626 (EP,US);
G01N29/032 (EP,US);
G01N29/22 (EP,US);
G01N29/223 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02433 (EP,US);
G01N2291/102 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM DETEKTIEREN VON LUFTBLASEN IN RÖHREN | [1994/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTION OF AIR BUBBLES IN TUBING | [1994/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETECTION DE BULLES D'AIR DANS DES TUBES | [1994/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1993 | Search fee paid | 05.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/09] | 10.10.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4112773 (ABTS LEIGH ROY); | [Y]SU974248 (KORMSHCHIKOV ALEKSANDR YU, et al); | [Y]DE3344848 (GUTTA GES FUER INFUSIONSTECHNI [DE]); | [Y]US4607520 (DAM NAIM [US]); | [Y]WO9116087 (INFUREX AG [CH]); | [YP]US5083452 (HOPE BJORN R [NO]) |