EP0581933 - POWERED HAND TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scintilla AG Postfach 632 4501 Solothurn / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states SCINTILLA AG Postfach 632 CH-4501 Solothurn / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLZER, Peter Allmendstr. 6E CH-4500 Solothurn / CH | 02 /
SCHAIBLE, Herman Häslimattstr. 6 CH-4652 Biberist / CH | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Wierspecker, Horst, et al c/o ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, Postfach 30 02 02 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1996/46] | Application number, filing date | 93903942.6 | 09.02.1993 | [1994/06] | WO1993EP00317 | Priority number, date | DE19924204947 | 19.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4204947 | [1994/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9316845 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581933 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581933 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02 | [1994/06] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/06] | Title | German: | KRAFTGETRIEBENE HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE | [1994/06] | English: | POWERED HAND TOOL | [1994/06] | French: | OUTIL A MAIN A MOTEUR | [1994/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 11.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Request for further processing for: | 13.09.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.11.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4991472 (HOLLINGSWORTH LYNDOL W [US]); | [X]DE3239238 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]); | [A]EP0129754 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |