EP0623245 - QUANTUM WELL INFRARED DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.1998 [1998/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PICOGIGA S.A. 5, rue de la Réunion, ZA de Courtaboeuf 91940 Les Ulis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states PICOGIGA S.A. 5, rue de la Réunion, ZA de Courtaboeuf F-91940 Les Ulis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUYEN, Linh, T. 6, rue Donizetti F-75016 Paris / FR | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique, et al Avocats à la Cour, Cabinet Bardehle, Pagenberg & Partner, 45, avenue Montaigne F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93904105.9 | 21.01.1993 | [1994/45] | WO1993FR00060 | Priority number, date | FR19920000667 | 22.01.1992 Original published format: FR 9200667 | [1994/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9315525 | Date: | 05.08.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623245 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0352 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01L31/035236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/45] | Title | German: | INFRAROT DETEKTOR MIT POTENTIALTOEPFEN | [1994/45] | English: | QUANTUM WELL INFRARED DETECTOR | [1994/45] | French: | DETECTEUR INFRAROUGE A PUITS QUANTIQUES | [1994/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 06.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/09] | 05.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.03.1995 | 31.01.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0299841 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 59, no. 15, 7 Octobre 1991, NEW YORK US pages 1864 - 1866 B. F. LEVINE ET AL. 'Normal incidence hole intersubband absorption long wavelength GaAs/AlxGa1-xAs quantum well infrared photodetectors' cité dans la demande | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. NEW YORK US pages 851 - 853 B. F. LEVINE ET AL. 'High sensitivity low dark current 10 um GaAs quantum well infrared photodetectors' | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 50, no. 16, 20 Avril 1987, NEW YORK US pages 1092 - 1094 B. F. LEVINE ET AL. 'New 10 um infrared detector using intersubband absorption in resonant tunneling GaAlAs superlattices' cité dans la demande | [A] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS vol. 64, no. 3, 1 Août 1988, NEW YORK US pages 1591 - 1593 B. F. LEVINE ET AL. 'Bound-to-extended state absorption GaAs superlattice transport infrared detectors' cité dans la demande | [XP] - JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART B vol. 10, no. 2, Mars 1992, NEW YORK US pages 995 - 997 J. M. KUO ET AL. 'Gas source molecular-beam epitaxial growth of normal incidence GaAs/AlGaAs quantum well infrared photodetectors' |