EP0630233 - COMPOSITION FOR ORAL PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAJIMA, Toshio, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | 02 /
ISHII, Kuniaki, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | 03 /
UMEKI, Nobuo, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | 04 /
ITAI, Shigeru, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | 05 /
HAYASHI, Hidefumi, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | 06 /
SHIMANO, Kimihide, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | 07 /
KOYAMA, Ikuo, Taisho Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 24-1, Takata 3-chome, Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93905625.5 | 10.03.1993 | [1994/52] | WO1993JP00291 | Priority number, date | JP19920053442 | 12.03.1992 Original published format: JP 5344292 | JP19920219904 | 19.08.1992 Original published format: JP 21990492 | [1994/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317667 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0630233 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0630233 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/00 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
A61K9/1617 (EP,US);
A61K9/0095 (EP,US);
A61K9/1635 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/52] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR ORALE ZUBEREITUNGEN | [1994/52] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR ORAL PREPARATIONS | [1994/52] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR PREPARATIONS BUVABLES | [1994/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 10.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.09.1996 | BE | 25.09.1996 | DK | 25.09.1996 | GR | 25.09.1996 | NL | 25.09.1996 | SE | 25.12.1996 | PT | 26.12.1996 | IE | 10.03.1997 | LU | 31.03.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [2001/01] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
IE | 10.03.1997 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
BE | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/25] | BE | 25.09.1996 | |
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | SE | 25.12.1996 | |
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 25.12.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3627885 (RONDELET JACQUES, et al); | [Y]US3857939 (GREEN J, et al); | [A]GB2122490 (ASTRA LAEKEMEDEL AB); | [A]EP0069097 ; | [A]EP0420992 (TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) | [Y] - DATABASE WPIL Week 9101, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 91-003127 | [A] - DATABASE WPI Week 7544, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 75-72937 |