EP0589047 - METHOD OF TREATING INFECTIOUS DISEASE, METHOD OF PREVENTING PUTREFACTION OF COSMETIC, AND ANTIBACTERIAL/ANTIFUNGAL AGENT AND COSMETIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2000 [2000/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0048 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0048 / JP | ||
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTSU, Yoshiro 11-1, Aosinke 5-chome Minoo-shi, Osaka 562 / JP | 02 /
ARIMA, Yaeno 8-25, Higashiochiai 3-chome, Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 654-01 / JP | 03 /
NAKAI, Yoriko 116, Kaibara, Kaibara-cho Hikami-gun, Hyogo 669-33 / JP | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93905631.3 | 10.03.1993 | [1994/13] | WO1993JP00297 | Priority number, date | JP19920055074 | 13.03.1992 Original published format: JP 5507492 | JP19920213841 | 11.08.1992 Original published format: JP 21384192 | [1994/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317559 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589047 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589047 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01N65/00, A61K7/00 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
A61K8/27 (EP);
A01N59/16 (EP);
A61K31/315 (EP);
A61K33/30 (EP);
A61K8/35 (EP);
A61Q17/005 (EP);
A61K2800/524 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/16, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/315, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/30, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1994/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG INFEKTIÖSER KRANKHEITEN, VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG DES VERDERBS VON KOSMETIKA, ANTIBAKTERIELLE UND SCHIMMELHEMMENDE MITTEL SOWIE KOSMETIKA | [1999/22] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING INFECTIOUS DISEASE, METHOD OF PREVENTING PUTREFACTION OF COSMETIC, AND ANTIBACTERIAL/ANTIFUNGAL AGENT AND COSMETIC | [1994/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES INFECTIEUSES, PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'EMPECHER LA PUTREFACTION DES PRODUITS COSMETIQUES, ET PRODUIT COSMETIQUE ET AGENT ANTIBACTERIENS/ANTIFONGIQUES | [1994/13] |
Former [1994/13] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG INFEKTIÖSER KRANKHEITEN, VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG DES VERDERBS VON KOSMETIKA, ANTIBAKTERIELLE UND SCHIMMELHEMMENDE MITTEL SOWIE KOSMTIKA | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1993 | Translation filed | 12.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 12.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 14.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63211218 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881227), vol. 12, no. 501, Database accession no. (C - 556)<3348> , & JP63211218 A 19880902 (NIPPON ZEORA K.K.) [A] 1-29 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS568309 (FUKUDA YASUAKI); | [X]JPS6293215 (SHISEIDO CO LTD); | [A]JPH02157201 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) |