EP0641569 - ANTIPRURITIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIKANO, Masahiko 619, Nanasaki, Sunami-cho Motosu-gun, Gifu 501-03 / JP | 02 /
NAKAO, Kenzo, Ono Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 1-5, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Stephen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Bentham, Stephen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93905632.1 | 11.03.1993 | [1995/10] | WO1993JP00298 | Priority number, date | JP19920088201 | 12.03.1992 Original published format: JP 8820192 | [1995/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317709 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641569 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K31/41, C07D405/04 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP);
A61K45/00 (KR);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/41 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/10] | Title | German: | ANTIPRURITISCHES AGENS | [1995/10] | English: | ANTIPRURITIC | [1995/10] | French: | AGENT ANTIPRURIGINEUX | [1995/10] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1994 | Translation filed | 02.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1994 | Search fee paid | 02.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 02.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 13.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/43] | 27.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/46] | 22.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5032606 (BECK ANDREAS [DE], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9118608 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0403249 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [XY]EP0469477 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3; | [Y] - NAKAI, H. ET AL., "New Potent Antagonists of Leukotrienes C4 and D4. 1. Synthesis and Structure-Activity Relationships", J. MED. CHEM., (1988), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 84 - 91, XP000608223 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00396a013 | [A] - TAN, J.K.L.; HABERMAN, H.F.; COLDMAN, A.J., "Identifying effective treatments for uremic pruritus.", J. AM. ACAD. DERMATOL., (1991), vol. 25, pages 811 - 818, XP000608649 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [T] - ROBERTSON K. E. AND MUELLER, B. A., "Uremic pruritus", AM. J. HEALTH-SYSTEM PHARMACISTS, (19960915), vol. 53, pages 2159 - 2170, XP000608429 [T] 1-3 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS6431757 (RII ROI MOOGAN); | [A]WO9204311 (SCHERING AG [DE]) |