EP0628057 - Use of a therapeutical COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF THERMAL INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/50] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF THERMAL INJURY | ||
[1999/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOARD OF REGENTS, THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM 201 West Seventh Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states BOARD OF REGENTS THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM 201 West Seventh Street Austin, TX 78731 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPSKY, Peter, E. 4406 Woodfin Dallas, TX 75220 / US | 02 /
MILESKI, William, J. 2508 Canyon Creek Drive Richardson, TX 75080 / US | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/50] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93905796.4 | 05.02.1993 | [1994/50] | WO1993US01030 | Priority number, date | US19920843112 | 28.02.1992 Original published format: US 843112 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317047 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628057 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628057 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, C12N5/20 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
C07K16/2845 (EP,US);
C07K16/2821 (EP,US);
C07K16/2854 (EP,US);
C07K16/2884 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/50] | C07K15/28, A61K39/395, C12N5/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/50] | Title | German: | Verwendung einer therapeutischen ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VERBRENNUNGEN | [1999/42] | English: | Use of a therapeutical COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF THERMAL INJURY | [1999/42] | French: | utilisage d'une COMPOSITION therapeutique pour le TRAITEMENT DE LESIONS D'ORIGINE THERMIQUE | [1999/42] |
Former [1994/50] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND METHODEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VERBRENNUNGEN | ||
Former [1994/50] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR THE TREATMENT OF THERMAL INJURY | ||
Former [1994/50] | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DE LESIONS D'ORIGINE THERMIQUE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.1994 | Search fee paid | 28.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.06.1996 | 28.02.1999 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.1999 | BE | 20.10.1999 | CH | 20.10.1999 | ES | 20.10.1999 | FR | 20.10.1999 | GR | 20.10.1999 | IT | 20.10.1999 | LI | 20.10.1999 | NL | 20.10.1999 | SE | 20.10.1999 | DK | 20.01.2000 | PT | 20.01.2000 | DE | 21.01.2000 | GB | 05.02.2000 | IE | 05.02.2000 | LU | 05.02.2000 | MC | 29.02.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
ES | 20.10.1999 | ||
FR | 20.10.1999 | ||
GR | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
NL | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
DK | 20.01.2000 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
DE | 21.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2000 | ||
LU | 05.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
ES | 20.10.1999 | ||
GR | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
NL | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
DK | 20.01.2000 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
DE | 21.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2000 | ||
LU | 05.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
ES | 20.10.1999 | ||
GR | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
NL | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
DK | 20.01.2000 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
DE | 21.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
ES | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
NL | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
DK | 20.01.2000 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
DE | 21.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
ES | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
NL | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
DE | 21.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
ES | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
DE | 21.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2000 | ||
MC | 29.02.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
ES | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
DE | 21.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
SE | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
DE | 21.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/09] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
DE | 21.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
IE | 05.02.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
GB | 05.02.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/06] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
FR | 17.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
CH | 20.10.1999 | ||
LI | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 20.10.1999 | |
BE | 20.10.1999 | ||
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
CH | 25.01.2000 | ||
LI | 25.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 20.10.1999 | |
PT | 20.01.2000 | ||
CH | 25.01.2000 | ||
LI | 25.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 20.10.1999 | |
PT | 20.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0314863 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al) [DX] 1-22 * page 5, line 18 - line 45 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0387668 (BLOOD RES LAB CENTER [US]) [X] 1-13,15-20 * page 12, line 31 - line 41 * * page 13, line 57 - page 14, line 19 * * claim - *; | [X]WO9116928 (CELLTECH LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 28, line 17 - page 29, line 15 * * claim - *; | [X]WO9119511 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 22, line 16 - line 22 * * page 23, line 17 - page 24, line 7 * * claim - *; | [X] - N. VEDDER ET AL., "Inhibition of leukocyte adherence by anti-CD18 monoclonal antibody attenuates reperfusion injury in the rabbit ear.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, WASHINGTON, DC, USA, (199004), vol. 87, no. 7, pages 2643 - 2646, XP002002531 [X] 1-13,15-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.7.2643 | [A] - M. MALDONADO ET AL., "Specific changes in peripheral blood lymphocyte phenotype from burn patients. Probable origin of the thermal injury-related lymphocytopenia.", BURNS, LONDON, GB, (199106), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 188 - 192, XP000569565 [A] 1-22 * discussion *;; table V * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0305-4179(91)90101-L | [PX] - W. MILESKI ET AL., "Inhibition of leukocyte-endothelial adherence following thermal injury.", JOURNAL OF SURGICAL RESEARCH, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, (199204), vol. 52, no. 4, pages 334 - 339, XP000569587 [PX] 1-22 * the whole document * | International search | [Y] - The New England Journal of Medicine, Volume 314, Number 15, issued 10 April 1986, F.D. MOORE et al.: "Neutrophil Activation in Thermal Injury as Assessed by Increased Expression of Complement Receptors", pages 948 to 953, see entire document. | [Y] - Journal of Clinical Investigation, Volume 81, Number 3, issued March 1988, N.B. VEDDER et al.: "A Monoclonal Antibody to the Adherence-Promoting Leukocyte Glycoprotein, CD18, Reduces Organ Injury and Improves Survival from Hemorrhagic Shock and Resuscitation in Rabbits", pages 939 to 944, see entire document. | [Y] - The Western Journal of Medicine, Volume 155, Number 4, issued October 1991, J.M. HARLAN et al.: "Mechanisms and Consequences of Leukocyte-Endothelial Interaction", pages 365 to 369, see entire document. | [Y] - International Journal of Cancer, Volume 37, issued 1986, K. SUGITA et al.: "Use of a Cocktail of Monoclonal Antibodies and Human Complement in Selective Killing of Acute Lymphocytic Leukemia Cells", pages 351 to 357, see entire document. |