EP0626825 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | For all designated states Agee, John M., Dr. 77 Scripps Drive, Suite 101 Sacramento, CA 95825 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/49] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
For all designated states Agee, John M., Dr. 77 Scripps Drive, Suite 101 Sacramento, CA 95825 / US | |||
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGEE, John M. 77 Scripps Drive, Suite 101 Sacramento, CA 95825 / US | 02 /
KING, Francis 77 Scripps Drive, Suite 101 Sacramento, CA 95825 / US | 03 /
ROMANKO, Kimberly, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint-Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
TURGEON, Thomas, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint-Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
FLOR, Lawrence, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint-Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
MITTELSTADT, William, A. P.O. Box 33427 Saint-Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [1994/49] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William Ladas & Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Molyneaux, Martyn William c/o Ladas & Parry, 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | ||
Former [1994/49] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93906047.1 | 18.02.1993 | [1994/49] | WO1993US01439 | Priority number, date | US19920838532 | 19.02.1992 Original published format: US 838532 | [1994/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9316649 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0626825 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0626825 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/320036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/49] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT | [1994/49] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [1994/49] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL | [1994/49] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/30: (deleted) | EPB 1998/30: (deleted) | EPB 1998/30: (deleted) | EPB 1997/48: Teilanmeldung 97116476.9 eingereicht am 22/09/97 | EPB 1997/48: Divisional application 97116476.9 filed on 22/09/97 | EPB 1997/48: Demande divisionnaire 97116476.9 déposée le 22/09/97 | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 12.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 07.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97116476.9 / EP0821914 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.1997 | 28.02.1998 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   08.05.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2737014 (WOLF GMBH RICHARD); | [A]US4729374 (ALFRANCA JOSE-MARIA P [ES]); | [A]US5089000 (AGEE JOHN M [US], et al) | by applicant | US4963147 | US4962770 | US5089000 |