EP0628102 - FLUOROCARBAMATE SOIL-RELEASE AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1998 [1998/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRCHNER, Jack, Robert 2423 Shellpot Drive Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93906066.1 | 24.02.1993 | [1994/50] | WO1993US01461 | Priority number, date | US19920843708 | 28.02.1992 Original published format: US 843708 | US19920843886 | 28.02.1992 Original published format: US 843886 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317165 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628102 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628102 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/576, C08G18/28 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
C07C275/62 (EP);
D06M15/576 (EP,KR);
C08G18/283 (EP);
C08G18/2885 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/50] | Title | German: | SCHMUTZABWEISENDE FLUORCARBAMATE | [1994/50] | English: | FLUOROCARBAMATE SOIL-RELEASE AGENTS | [1994/50] | French: | AGENTS ANTISALISSURES DE FLOROCARBAMATE | [1994/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 23.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0435641 (DU PONT [US]); | [AP]WO9301349 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US3872058 (GRESHAM JOHN T); | [A]EP0414155 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0231927 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0253186 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]DE1956198 (ALLIED CHEM) |