EP0638187 - CATEGORIZING STRINGS IN CHARACTER RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, IT, LI | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPLAN, Ronald, M. 4015 Orme Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
SHUCHATOWITZ, Robert 19 Wiltshire Road Brighton, MA 02135 / US | 03 /
MULLINS, Atty, T. 396 Marborough Street, 2 Boston, MA 02115 / US | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Walker, Antony James Alexander, et al W.P. Thompson & Co., Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Walker, Antony James Alexander, et al W.P. Thomson & Co., Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [1995/07] | Reynolds, Julian David Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93906168.5 | 23.02.1993 | [1995/07] | WO1993US01590 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9419757 | Date: | 01.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638187 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638187 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.09.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
G06F16/90344 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/34] | G06F15/40, G06F15/415 | ||
Former IPC [1995/07] | G06F15/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/07] | Title | German: | KATEGORISIERENDE ZEICHENKETTEN IN DER ZEICHENERKENNUNG. | [1995/07] | English: | CATEGORIZING STRINGS IN CHARACTER RECOGNITION | [1995/07] | French: | CATEGORISATION DES CHAINES DANS LA RECONNAISSANCE DES CARACTERES | [1995/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 14.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 31.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Request for further processing for: | 22.03.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.04.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2001 | BE | 25.07.2001 | CH | 25.07.2001 | IT | 25.07.2001 | LI | 25.07.2001 | NL | 25.07.2001 | PT | 25.10.2001 | GR | 26.10.2001 | ES | 31.01.2002 | LU | 23.02.2002 | SE | 24.02.2002 | IE | 25.02.2002 | DK | 28.02.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/51] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
GR | 26.10.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
LU | 23.02.2002 | ||
SE | 24.02.2002 | ||
IE | 25.02.2002 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
LU | 23.02.2002 | ||
SE | 24.02.2002 | ||
IE | 25.02.2002 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
ES | 31.01.2002 | ||
SE | 24.02.2002 | ||
IE | 25.02.2002 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 24.02.2002 | ||
IE | 25.02.2002 | ||
DK | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 24.02.2002 | ||
IE | 25.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
NL | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 24.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
SE | 24.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/29] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
BE | 25.07.2001 | ||
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 25.07.2001 | |
PT | 25.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 25.07.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8301329 (SYSTEM DEV CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0282721 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-10* abstract * | International search | [A]US4034343 (WILMER MICHAEL E); | [X]US4750122 (KAJI HIROYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4985863 (FUJISAWA HIROMICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4989258 (TAKAHASHI HIROYASU [JP], et al); | [A]US5003614 (TANAKA YUZURU [JP], et al) | Examination | - REVUZ, UNIVERSITE DE PARIS |