EP0584331 - DISTRIBUTION BOARD WITH REAR ELECTRICAL ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road, Executive Plaza Palatine Illinois 60067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road, Executive Plaza Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | ||
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 S. Roselle Road Palatine, IL 60067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEILL, Kenneth 7 Bedwyn Close Swindon Wiltshire SN2 1SG / GB | 02 /
BALL, Keith, W. 168 Whitworth Road Swindon Wiltshire SN2 3BJ / GB | [1994/09] | Representative(s) | Sorrell, Terence Gordon Fitzpatricks, Cardinal Court, 23, Thomas More Street London E1 9YY / GB | [1994/09] | Application number, filing date | 93906195.8 | 23.02.1993 | [1994/09] | WO1993US01640 | Priority number, date | US19920849243 | 11.03.1992 Original published format: US 849243 | [1994/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9318564 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584331 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584331 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02B11/12, H02B13/02, H02B1/20, H05K7/16, H01H85/20, H02B1/21, H02B11/02, H02B11/127 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
H02B11/12 (EP,US);
H02B1/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/09] | H02B11/12, H02B13/02, H02B1/20, H05K7/16, H01H85/20 | Designated contracting states | GB, IE [1994/09] | Title | German: | VERTEILERTAFEL MIT ELEKTRISCHEN ZUGRIFF VON HINTEN | [1994/09] | English: | DISTRIBUTION BOARD WITH REAR ELECTRICAL ACCESS | [1994/09] | French: | TABLEAU DE DISTRIBUTION A ACCES ELECTRIQUE POSTERIEUR | [1994/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.1993 | Search fee paid | 01.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 19.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2976510 (ALBERT BLAIN) [A] 3,9,12,16 * figure 1 *; | [X]US3293503 (HERRMANN JOHN A, et al) [X] 1-20 * figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]FR2344155 (ALSTHOM CGEE [FR]) [A] 1-20 * page 5, line 23 - line 34 * * figure 9 *; | [X]EP0092774 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-20 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4498123 (FUSS PETER S [US], et al) [A] 5,10,11,14,15 * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, line 22 - line 36 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US4502097 (TAKAHASHI MASARU [JP]) [X] 5 * column 7, line 26 - line 31 * * figures 1,3-6 *; | [A]GB2245156 (DASCO DATA PROD LTD [CA]) [A] 5,10,14* figure 2 * | [A] - L. DESCHAMPS, "< | International search | [Y]US2542853 (WILLS ERVIN E); | [Y]EP0086954 (STOP CHOC SCHWINGUNGSTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [Y]US4496916 (CARPENTER PETER E G [GB], et al); | [A]US4602312 (TAKAHASHI MASARU [JP]) |