EP0630350 - CHEMICAL OXYGEN GENERATING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING Li 2?O 2? [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PURITAN-BENNETT CORPORATION 10800 Pflumm Road Lenexa, KS 66215-2198 / US | [1994/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yunchang 13229 West 107th Terrace Lenexa, KS 66210 / US | 02 /
CANNON, James, C. 11716 Woodward Overland Park, Kansas 66210 / US | [1995/03] |
Former [1994/52] | 01 /
ZHANG, Yunchang 13229 West 107th Terrace Lenexa, KS 66210 / US | ||
02 /
CANNON, James, C. 15110 West 123rd Street Olathe, KS 66062 / US | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93906197.4 | 23.02.1993 | [1994/52] | WO1993US01643 | Priority number, date | US19920850516 | 13.03.1992 Original published format: US 850516 | [1994/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317962 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0630350 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/02 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
C01B13/0296 (EP,US);
B01J23/04 (EP,US);
C01B13/0211 (EP,US);
C01B13/0218 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/52] | C01B11/14, C01B11/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/52] | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE SAUERSTOFF GENERIERENDE LI2O2 ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1994/52] | English: | CHEMICAL OXYGEN GENERATING COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING Li 2?O 2? | [1994/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS CHIMIQUES GENERANT DE L'OXYGENE ET CONTENANT Li 2?O 2? | [1994/52] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.1994 | Search fee paid | 13.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 10.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/50] | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3293187 (MARKOWITZ MEYER M) [A] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, line 54 - line 71 * * example -; claim - * | International search | [X]CN1035248 (QINGHAI SALT LAKE INST CHINESE [CN]); | [A]US3702305 (THOMPSON TOMMY LEWIS) |