EP0640136 - GENETIC SEQUENCES ENCODING FLAVONOID PATHWAY ENZYMES WITH FLAVONOID 3'-HYDROXYLASE ACTIVITY AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/09] | GENETIC SEQUENCES ENCODING FLAVONOID PATHWAY ENZYMES AND USES THEREFOR | ||
[2002/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLOWER DEVELOPMENTS Pty. Ltd. 16 Gipps Street Collingwood Victoria 3066 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL FLOWER DEVELOPMENTS Pty. Ltd. 16 Gipps Street Collingwood, Victoria 3066 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLTON, Timothy Albert Unit 1, 19 Oldis Avenue Northcote, VIC 3070 / AU | 02 /
CORNISH, Edwina, Cecily Lot 33, Leadbetter Road Upper Beaconsfield, VIC 3808 / AU | 03 /
TANAKA, Yoshikazu 5/49 Bellevue Avenue Rosanna, VIC 3084 / AU | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Dzieglewska, Hanna Eva, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93906393.9 | 25.03.1993 | [1995/09] | WO1993AU00127 | Priority number, date | AU19920001538 | 27.03.1992 Original published format: AU 153892 | AU19930006698 | 07.01.1993 Original published format: AU 669893 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9320206 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640136 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0640136 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.10.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/53, C12N15/82, C12N9/02, C12Q1/68, A01H5/00 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
C12N9/0073 (EP,US);
C12N15/825 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6895 (EP,US);
C12Y114/13021 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/09] | C12N15/53, C12N15/11, C12N9/02, C12Q1/68, A01H5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | GENSEQUENZEN KODIEREND FÜR ENZYME DES FLAVONOID STOFFWECHSELWEGES MIT EINER FLAVONOID 3'-HYDROXYLASE AKTIVITÄT UNE IHRE ANWENDUNGEN | [2002/38] | English: | GENETIC SEQUENCES ENCODING FLAVONOID PATHWAY ENZYMES WITH FLAVONOID 3'-HYDROXYLASE ACTIVITY AND USES THEREOF | [2002/38] | French: | SEQUENCES GENETIQUES CODANT POUR DES ENZYMES DE LA CASCADE DES FLAVONOIDES AYANT UNE ACTIVITE FLAVONOIDE 3'-HYDROXYLASE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS. | [2002/38] |
Former [1995/09] | GENSEQUENZEN KODIEREND FÜR ENZYME DES FLAVONOID STOFFWECHSELWEGES UND IHRE ANWENDUNGEN | ||
Former [1995/09] | GENETIC SEQUENCES ENCODING FLAVONOID PATHWAY ENZYMES AND USES THEREFOR | ||
Former [1995/09] | SEQUENCES GENETIQUES CODANT DES ENZYMES D'ACCES DES FLAVONOIDES ET UTILISATIONS DE CES SEQUENCES | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1994 | Search fee paid | 25.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 25.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 21.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Request for further processing for: | 25.05.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2003 | CH | 07.05.2003 | LI | 07.05.2003 | GR | 07.08.2003 | PT | 07.08.2003 | SE | 07.08.2003 | [2004/03] |
Former [2004/02] | CH | 07.05.2003 | |
LI | 07.05.2003 | ||
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
PT | 07.08.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 07.05.2003 | |
LI | 07.05.2003 | ||
SE | 07.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 07.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0086649 (FLOREY HOWARD INST [AU]) [X] 14,15 * fig. 6 sequence 1 and page 8 *; | [X]EP0335635 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [X] 14,16 * page 6, line 50 *; | [X]WO9004028 (EUROGENTEC SA [BE]) [X] 14,15 * page 32 amplimer 4b *; | [E]WO9318155 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [E] 14,16 * the whole document *; | EP0632128 [ ] (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]); | [X] - STOTZ, G., ET AL., "Genetic and biochemical studies on flavonoid 3'-hydroxylation in flowers of Petunia hybrida", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, vol. 70, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00304915, pages 300 - 305, XP000562705 [X] 18-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00304915 | [X] - LARSON, R.L., ET AL., "Microsomal flavonoid 3'-monooxygenase from maize seedlings", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, vol. 80, pages 483 - 486, XP000563562 [X] 18,19 * the whole document * | [X] - FORKMANN, G., "Flavonoids as flower pigments: the formation of the natural spectrum and its extension by genetic engineering", PLANT BREEDING, vol. 106, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1439-0523.1991.tb00474.x, pages 1 - 26, XP002003847 [X] 18-20 * page 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1439-0523.1991.tb00474.x | [A] - NIKKEI BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 238, no. '91.8-26, pages 1 - 2 [A] 14-17 * the whole document * | [A] - MOL, J.N.M., ET AL., "Genetic manipulation of floral pigmentation genes", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 13, pages 287 - 294 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * | [A] - BOZAK, K.R., ET AL., "Sequence analysis of ripening-related cytochrome P-450 cDNAs from avocado fruit", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, vol. 87, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.87.10.3904, pages 3904 - 3908, XP002003848 [A] 1-30 * page 3907, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.10.3904 | [A] - GOULD, S.J., ET AL., "Use of DNA polymerase chain reaction for homology probing: isolation of partial cDNA or genomic clones encoding the iron-sulfur protein of succinate dehydrogenase from several species", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, vol. 86, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.86.6.1934, pages 1934 - 1938, XP002003849 [A] 1-30 * page 1936, column L - page 1938 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.6.1934 | [A] - KALMAN, M., ET AL., "Polymerase chain reaction (PCR) amplification with a single specific primer", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ORLANDO, FL US, vol. 167, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-291X(90)92052-2, pages 504 - 506, XP024837237 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(90)92052-2 | International search | [Y]AU5412390 (BIONOVA HOLDING CORP); | [PX]AU1953092 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD) | [XY] - The Journal of Biological Chemistry, Volume 267, No. 8, issued March 15, 1992, BRISTCH et al., "Molecular Cloning, Sequence Analysis, and In Vitro Expression of Flavanone 3B-Hydroxylase from Petunia Hybrida", pp 5380-5387, Abstract, figure 3, page 5383, figure 5, page 5384, figure 8. |