EP0639129 - IMPROVED INFANT PUSH-CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCKWELL, Andrew 10 Kensington Gardens Square London W2 4BH / GB | [1995/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Whitaker, Iain Mark, et al Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | Whitaker, Iain Mark, et al Sommerville & Rushton Business Link Building 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | ||
Former [1998/38] | Flynn, Michael Joseph, et al William Jones, Willow Lane House, Willow Lane Norwich NR2 1EU / IE | ||
Former [1995/08] | Jones, William Willow Lane House Willow Lane Norwich Norfolk, NR2 1EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93906732.8 | 23.03.1993 | [1995/08] | WO1993GB00595 | Priority number, date | GB19920006271 | 23.03.1992 Original published format: GB 9206271 | [1995/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9318955 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639129 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639129 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B62B7/02 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
B62B9/02 (EP);
B62B2301/08 (EP);
B62B3/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER KINDERWAGEN | [1995/08] | English: | IMPROVED INFANT PUSH-CHAIR | [1995/08] | French: | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A UNE POUSSETTE POUR ENFANT | [1995/08] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 10.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Request for further processing for: | 16.08.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 11.08.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.08.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.1995 | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.1996 | 31.03.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.1997 | 31.03.1999 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.1999 | 31.03.2000 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   08.09.2000 | 31.03.2001 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2001 | BE | 07.11.2001 | CH | 07.11.2001 | LI | 07.11.2001 | NL | 07.11.2001 | DK | 07.02.2002 | SE | 07.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 07.11.2001 | |
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 07.11.2001 | |
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 07.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [X]US1327864 (HERBERT EVERINGHAM JOHN); | [X]US1429966 (OLSEN HARRY R); | [X]FR951157 ; | [X]US3229990 (RUDOLF WEINER); | [X]FR2335384 (NUSSAC JEAN DE [FR]); | [X]CA1209166 (JOHNSON ERIC N); | [Y]DE3519088 (FISCHER DIETER R DR) |