blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0589049

EP0589049 - THIN POLYSILICON FILM AND PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kanegafuchi Chemical Industry Co., Ltd.
2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/13]For all designated states
Kanegafuchi Chemical Industry Co., Ltd.
2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome
Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAMOTO, Kenji
1-3-504, Yoshida-cho 1-chome, Hyogo-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652 / JP
[1994/13]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1994/13]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
D-81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date93906804.523.03.1993
[1994/13]
WO1993JP00338
Priority number, dateJP1992010056625.03.1992         Original published format: JP 10056692
JP1992010056725.03.1992         Original published format: JP 10056792
JP1992010189828.03.1992         Original published format: JP 10189892
JP1992010925901.04.1992         Original published format: JP 10925992
[1994/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9319022
Date:30.09.1993
Language:EN
[1993/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0589049
Date:30.03.1994
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1994/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0589049
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP30.09.1993
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.1997
ClassificationIPC:C04B41/82
[1994/13]
CPC:
C03C17/22 (EP,US); C03C2217/282 (EP,US); C03C2218/15 (EP,US);
C03C2218/17 (EP,US); Y10S117/904 (EP); Y10S148/093 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1994/13]
TitleGerman:DÜNNFILM AUS POLYSILIZIUM UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG[1999/33]
English:THIN POLYSILICON FILM AND PRODUCTION THEREOF[1994/13]
French:COUCHE MINCE DE POLYSILICIUM ET SA FABRICATION[1994/13]
Former [1994/13]POLYSILIZIUMDÜNNSCHICHT UND IHRE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN
Entry into regional phase24.11.1993Translation filed 
23.12.1993National basic fee paid 
23.12.1993Search fee paid 
23.12.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.1994Examination requested  [1994/19]
21.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
07.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.1999Fee for grant paid
15.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPS5643734  (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK);
 [A]JPS5893243  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JPS62292695  (RICOH KK, et al);
 [A]JPS6435960  (RICOH KK, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.