EP0589050 - TIRE VULCANIZING PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBESEIKOSHO 3-18, Wakinohama-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBESEIKOSHO 3-18, Wakinohama-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKAWA, Katsumi, Iwaya Plant in KK. Kobeseikosho 1-1, Hinode-cho 4-chome, Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 657 / JP | 02 /
URESHINO, Kashiro, Iwaya Plant in KK. Kobeseikosho 1-1, Hinode-cho 4-chome, Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 657 / JP | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Bühling, Gerhard, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Bühling, Gerhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93906806.0 | 24.03.1993 | [1994/13] | WO1993JP00341 | Priority number, date | JP19920098716 | 24.03.1992 Original published format: JP 9871692 | JP19920213064 | 10.08.1992 Original published format: JP 21306492 | JP19920262072 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: JP 26207292 | [1994/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9318903 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0589050 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/20, B29C33/22, B30B15/04, // B29D30/08, B29C35/04 | [1994/13] | CPC: |
B30B1/323 (EP,US);
B29C33/202 (EP,US);
B29D30/0601 (EP,US);
B30B15/04 (EP,US);
B30B15/041 (EP,US);
B30B15/042 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1994/13] | Title | German: | REIFENVULKANISIERPRESSE | [1994/13] | English: | TIRE VULCANIZING PRESS | [1994/13] | French: | PRESSE A VULCANISATION DE PNEUMATIQUES | [1994/13] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1993 | Translation filed | 12.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 12.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 24.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/35] | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0459375 (PIRELLI [IT]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6,7; | [Y]DE2460731 (IHLE REIFEN GMBH) [Y] 2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0037703 (NRM CORP [US]) [X] 1,3 * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 27; figures 1-3 * [A] 6,7; | [A]EP0050520 (PRINCE CORP [US]) [A] 2,4 * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 7; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4610618 (SCHMIDTS KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 4; | [A]DE3432286 (HOESCH AG) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]US3783775 (VON PLATEN B, et al) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS62267100 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880506), vol. 12, no. 145, Database accession no. (M - 693)<2992>, & JP62267100 A 19871119 (AMADA CO. LTD.) [A] 1,3 * abstract and figures * | International search | [X]JPH02127409U |