EP0642535 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING LOW DENSITY POROUS CROSS-LINKED POLYMERIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Oil Company One Shell Plaza, P.O. Box 2463 Houston, Texas 77252-2463 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | For all designated states SHELL OIL COMPANY One Shell Plaza, P.O. Box 2463 Houston, Texas 77252-2463 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWNSCOMBE, Thomas, Fairchild 2737 Amherst Houston, TX 77005 / US | 02 /
GERGEN, William, Peter 11311 Hylander Drive Houston, TX 77070 / US | 03 /
BASS, Ronald, Marshall 3772 Ingold Houston, TX 77005 / US | 04 /
MORES, Maryanne 1822 Barker-Cypress Houston, TX 77084 / US | 05 /
WONG, Pui, Kwan 6431 Mercer Street Houston, TX 77005 / US | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/11] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93907025.6 | 23.02.1993 | [1995/11] | WO1993US01673 | Priority number, date | US19920891322 | 29.05.1992 Original published format: US 891322 | [1995/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9324535 | Date: | 09.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642535 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0642535 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/32 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
C08F2/32 (EP,US);
C08J9/283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PORÖSE VERNETZTE POLYMERE MIT NIEDRIGER DICHTE | [1995/11] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING LOW DENSITY POROUS CROSS-LINKED POLYMERIC MATERIALS | [1995/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE MATERIAUX POLYMERES POREUX RETICULES BASSE DENSITE | [1995/11] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 21.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.10.1996 | BE | 09.10.1996 | CH | 09.10.1996 | DK | 09.10.1996 | ES | 09.10.1996 | GR | 09.10.1996 | LI | 09.10.1996 | PT | 09.01.1997 | SE | 09.01.1997 | IE | 23.02.1997 | LU | 28.02.1997 | [2002/26] |
Former [2001/01] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
DK | 09.10.1996 | ||
GR | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
PT | 09.01.1997 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
IE | 23.02.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
DK | 09.10.1996 | ||
GR | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
PT | 09.01.1997 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
DK | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
PT | 09.01.1997 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
PT | 09.01.1997 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
SE | 09.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 09.10.1996 | |
BE | 09.10.1996 | ||
CH | 09.10.1996 | ||
LI | 09.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 09.10.1996 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0161526 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |