EP0705287 - POLYUREAURETHANE PRIMERLESS STRUCTURAL ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASHLAND OIL, INC. P.O.Box 2219 Columbus, OH 43216 / US | [1996/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Daniel, A. 2112 Surrywood Drive Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93907410.0 | 11.03.1993 | [1996/15] | WO1993US02205 | Priority number, date | US19920849850 | 12.03.1992 Original published format: US 849850 | [1996/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9318074 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0705287 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0705287 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/24, C08G18/32 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
C08J5/124 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/76 (EP,US);
C08G18/797 (EP,US);
C09J175/12 (EP,US);
C08J2367/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/15] | Title | German: | GRUNDIERLACKFREIER STRUKTURELLER POLYHARNSTOFFURETHAN-KLEBSTOFF | [1996/15] | English: | POLYUREAURETHANE PRIMERLESS STRUCTURAL ADHESIVE | [1996/15] | French: | ADHESIF STRUCTUREL POLYUREE-URETHANE SANS APPRET | [1996/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 21.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.12.1994 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 24.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Request for further processing for: | 22.01.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.11.1994 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   21.11.1994 | 21.11.1994 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   21.11.1994 | 21.11.1994 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   21.11.1994 | 21.11.1994 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   21.11.1994 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.11.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   21.12.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XY]US4444976 (RABITO THOMAS G [US]) |