blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0633894

EP0633894 - PEPTIDES OF AN ANTIGEN, CAPABLE OF RECOGNITION BY OR INDUCTION OF CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTES, AND METHOD OF THEIR IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 05.06.2002  [2002/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oxxon Pharmaccines Limited
Boswell House, 1-5 Broad Street
Oxford, OX1 3AW / GB
[2000/02]
Former [1995/03]For all designated states
ISIS INNOVATION LIMITED
2 South Parks Road
Oxford OX1 3UB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / HILL, Adrian Vivian Sinton
Balliol College, BroaddStreet
Oxford OX1 3BJ / GB
02 / GOTCH, Frances Margaret
1 First Turn
Wolvercote, Oxford OX2 8AG / GB
03 / ELVIN, John
Trinity College, Broad Street
Oxford OX1 3BJ / GB
04 / McMICHAEL, Andrew James
5 The Green
Horton-cum-Studley, Oxfordshire OX33 1AE / GB
05 / WHITTLE, Hilton Carter, Medical Res. Council Lab.
Fajara, P.O. Box 273
Banjul / GM
[1995/03]
Representative(s)Maschio, Antonio, et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Maschio, Antonio, et al
D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [2000/22]Boden, Keith McMurray, et al
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [1995/03]Pennant, Pyers
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street
London EC4Y 1LL / GB
Application number, filing date93907995.005.04.1993
[1995/03]
WO1993GB00711
Priority number, dateGB1992000806803.04.1992         Original published format: GB 9208068
GB1992001770420.08.1992         Original published format: GB 9217704
[1995/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9320103
Date:14.10.1993
[1993/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0633894
Date:18.01.1995
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1995/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0633894
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.11.1993
ClassificationIPC:C07K14/445, C07K14/155, A61K39/015, G01N33/68
[1999/10]
CPC:
C07K14/005 (EP,US); A61P33/06 (EP); C07K14/445 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US); C12N2740/15022 (EP,US); Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1995/03]C07K7/00, A61K39/21, C07K15/00, G01N33/68, A61K39/015
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1995/03]
TitleGerman:PEPTIDE EINES ANTIGENS, DIE ZUR ERKENNUNG DURCH ODER INDUKTION VON CYTOTOXISCHEN T-LYMPHOCYTEN FÄHIG SIND, UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER IDENTIFIZIERUNG[1995/03]
English:PEPTIDES OF AN ANTIGEN, CAPABLE OF RECOGNITION BY OR INDUCTION OF CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTES, AND METHOD OF THEIR IDENTIFICATION[1995/03]
French:PEPTIDES D'UN ANTIGENE RECONNAISSABLES PAR DES LYMPHOCYTES T CYTOTOXIQUES OU INDUCTEURS DE CES DERNIERS, ET METHODE D'IDENTIFICATION[1995/03]
Entry into regional phase04.10.1994National basic fee paid 
04.10.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.1994Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.11.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.10.1994Examination requested  [1995/03]
20.10.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.1999Fee for grant paid
08.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Request for further processing for:10.07.1996Request for further processing filed
10.07.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.07.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
19.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE05.01.2000
[2002/23]
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0398540  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]);
 [X]EP0432965  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.