EP0585446 - LOW PRESSURE MERCURY VAPOR DISCHARGE LAMP CONTAINING AN AMALGAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.1997 [1997/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLOWIL INTERNATIONAL LIGHTING (HOLDING) B.V. "Atrium" Building 2nd Floor, Strawinskylaan 3037 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states FLOWIL INTERNATIONAL LIGHTING (HOLDING) B.V. "Atrium" Building 2nd Floor, Strawinskylaan 3037 NL-1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSMAN, Mark, W. 249 Rutledge Rd. Belmont, MA 02178 / US | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Butler, Michael John, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London, WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93908141.0 | 08.03.1993 | [1994/10] | WO1993NL00053 | Priority number, date | US19920850763 | 13.03.1992 Original published format: US 850763 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9318542 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585446 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585446 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/28, H01J61/72 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
H01J61/327 (EP,US);
H01J61/24 (EP,US);
H01J61/307 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/10] | Title | German: | EINE AMALGAM ENTHALTENDE NIEDERDRUCK-QUECKSILBER-ENTLADUNGSLAMPE | [1994/10] | English: | LOW PRESSURE MERCURY VAPOR DISCHARGE LAMP CONTAINING AN AMALGAM | [1994/10] | French: | LAMPE A DECHARGE A VAPEUR DE MERCURE A BASSE PRESSION CONTENANT UN AMALGAME | [1994/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/13] | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 27.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/25] | Request for further processing for: | 11.12.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.12.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2203283 (TOSHIBA KK); | [A]EP0373567 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY [JP]); | [A]DE1133824 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH) | [A] - NEUES AUS DER TECHNIK no. 2, 20 May 1988, WURZBURG DE pages 3 - 4 'Niederdruck-Quecksilberdampf Entladungslampe' |