EP0644900 - A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY TO A HUMAN MDR1 MULTIDRUG RESISTANCE GENE PRODUCT, AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/13] | A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY TO A HUMAN MDR1 MULTIDRUG RESISTANCE GENE PRODUCT, AND USES | ||
[2002/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana-Champaign, IL 61801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois 352 Henry Administration Building 506 South Wright Street Urbana-Champaign, IL 61801 / US | ||
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ILLINOIS 346 Henry Administration Building Urbana-Champaign, IL 60611 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MECHETNER, Eugene 5325 South Hyde Park Blvd., Apt. 1B Chicago, IL 60615 / US | 02 /
RONINSON, Igor, B. 2731 Lincoln Lane Wilmette, IL 60091 / US | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93908345.7 | 17.03.1993 | [1995/13] | WO1993US02347 | Priority number, date | US19920854881 | 20.03.1992 Original published format: US 854881 | US19930032056 | 16.03.1993 Original published format: US 32056 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319094 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644900 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644900 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C12N5/20, C12P21/08, C07K16/18, G01N33/53, A61K39/395 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
C07K2/00 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N5/12 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/51] | C12N15/13, C12N5/20, C12P21/08, C07K15/06, G01N33/53, A61K39/395 | ||
Former IPC [1995/13] | C07K15/28, C12N5/20, C12P21/08, C07K15/06, G01N33/53, A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/13] | Title | German: | MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN EIN HUMANES MDR1-GEN PRODUKT, DAS EINE RESISTENZ GEGEN VERSCHIEDENE MEDIKAMENTE ERZEUGT UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [1995/13] | English: | A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY TO A HUMAN MDR1 MULTIDRUG RESISTANCE GENE PRODUCT, AND ITS USE | [2002/35] | French: | UN ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL DIRIGE CONTRE UN PRODUIT DU GENE MDR-1 HUMAIN QUI CONFERE UNE RESISTANCE A PLUSIEURS MEDICAMENTS ET SON UTILISATION | [2002/35] |
Former [1995/13] | A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY TO A HUMAN MDR1 MULTIDRUG RESISTANCE GENE PRODUCT, AND USES | ||
Former [1995/13] | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL DIRIGE CONTRE UN PRODUIT GENIQUE MDR1 RESISTANT A L'EFFET DE PLUSIEURS MEDICAMENTS ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION ASSOCIES | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.1994 | Search fee paid | 20.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 07.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   17.04.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2003 | DK | 11.09.2003 | GR | 11.09.2003 | PT | 11.09.2003 | [2004/29] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 11.09.2003 | |
PT | 11.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0267781 (ONTARIO CANCER INST [CA]); | [A] - CHEVALLIER-MULTON ET AL, "IMPORTANCE OF THE FOURTH EXTERNAL LOOP IN IMMUNOGENICITY OF THE MULTIDRUG RESISTANCE RELATED P-GLYCOPROTEIN", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHARMACOLOGY, vol. 2, pages 165 - 170 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - YANG ET AL, "THE FIRST EXTRACELLULAR DOMAIN OF P170 GLYCOPROTEIN: CHARACTERIZATION OF STRUCTURE AND FUNCTION WITH A MONOCLONAL ANTI-PEPTIDE ANTIBODY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 31, page 376, XP000943327 [A] 1-25 * abstract 2232 * | [PX] - CHAUDHARY ET AL, "EXPRESSION AND ACTIVITY OF THE MULTIDRUG RESISTANCE P-GLYCOPROTEIN IN HUMAN PERIPHERAL BLOOD LYMPHOCYTES", BLOOD, vol. 80, no. 11, pages 2735 - 2739 [PX] 1-25 * the whole document * | [PX] - MECHETNER ET AL, "EFFICIENT INHIBITION OF P-GLYCOPROTEIN-MEDIATED MULTIDRUG RESISTANCE WITH A MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, vol. 89, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.89.13.5824, pages 5824 - 5828, XP002060367 [PX] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.13.5824 | [OPX] - NISHII ET AL, "P-GLYCOPROTEIN EXPRESSION IN HUMAN LYMPH NODE", THE MECHANISM AND NEW APPROACH ON DRUG RESISTANCE OF CANCER CELLS.PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON THE MECHANISM AND NEW APPROACH ON DRUG RESISTANCE OF CANCER CELLS.1993 EXCERPTA MEDICA, SAPPORO, pages 37 - 43 [OPX] 1-25 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4925787 (TANIHARA MASAO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5091513 (HUSTON JAMES S [US], et al) | [Y] - Nature, Volume 348, issued 06 December 1990, JOHN McCAFFERTY et al., "Phage Antibodies: Filamentous Phage Displaying Antibody Variable Domains", pages 552-554, see entire document. | [Y] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, Volume 83, issued October 1986, HIROFUMI HAMADA et al., "Functional Role for the 170-to 180-kDa Glycoprotein Specific to Drug-Resistant Tumor Cells as Revealed by Monoclonal Antibodies", pages 7785-7789, see entire document. | [Y] - Cancer Research, Volume 49, No. 12, issued 15 June 1989, MARIAN MEYERS et al., "Characterization of Monoclonal Antibodies Recognizing M 180,000 P-Glycoprotein: Differential Expression of the Mr 180,000 and Mr 170,000 P-Glycoproteins in Multidrug-Resistant Human Tumor Cells", pages 3209-3214, see entire document. | [Y] - Cancer, Volume 66, No. 5, issued 01 September 1990, YASUO KAWAZURU et al., "Expression of the Multidrug Transporter, P-Glycoprotein, in Acute Leukemia Cells and Correlation to Clinical Drug Resistance", pages 868-873, see entire document. | [Y] - Molecular and Cellular Biology, Volume 6, No. 10, issued November 1986, D.W. SHEN et al., "Multidrug Resistance of DNA-Mediated Transformants is Linked to Transfer of the Human mdr1 Gene", pages 4039-4045, see entire document. | [Y] - Monoclonal Antibodies '84: Biological and Clinical Applications, published 1985, P.E. THORPE, "Antibody Carriers of Cytotoxic Agents in Cancer Therapy: A Review", pages 475-506, see entire document. |