EP0633768 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF MICROCAPSULES OR LIPOSOMES WITH CONTROLLED SIZES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 15, quai Anatole France 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE 15, quai Anatole France F-75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROUX, Didier 54, avenue Gambetta F-33700 Mérignac / FR | 02 /
DIAT, Olivier 126, rue Belleville F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | 03 /
LAVERSANNE, René 62, avenue du Parc-d'Espagne F-33600 Pessac / FR | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93908988.4 | 02.04.1993 | [1995/03] | WO1993FR00335 | Priority number, date | FR19920004108 | 03.04.1992 Original published format: FR 9204108 | [1995/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319735 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633768 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0633768 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
A61K9/1277 (EP,US);
A61K9/5089 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2984 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIKROKAPSELN ODER LIPOSOMEN DEFINIERTER GRÖSSE | [1995/03] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF MICROCAPSULES OR LIPOSOMES WITH CONTROLLED SIZES | [1995/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE MICRO-CAPSULES OU DE LIPOSOMES DE TAILLES CONTROLEES | [1995/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.11.1995 | SE | 15.02.1996 | CH | 30.04.1996 | LI | 30.04.1996 | LU | 30.04.1996 | [2003/08] |
Former [2000/07] | SE | 15.02.1996 | |
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | SE | 15.02.1996 | |
CH | 30.04.1996 | ||
LI | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | SE | 15.02.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1376166 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO); | [A]DE4038075 ; | [A]WO8602264 (LUISI PIER LUIGI [CH]); | [A]EP0466236 (QUEST INT [NL]) |