EP0590135 - CDMA FREQUENCY ALLOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUDMUNDSON, Björn Orsavägen 13 S-191 71 Sollentuna / SE | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB, Patent Unit Radio Access 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2001/12] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1998/29] | Norin, Klas, et al Ericsson Radio Systems AB Common Patent Department KI/ERA/JT/P 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1994/14] | Lövgren, Tage, et al Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson Patent Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 93909116.1 | 07.04.1993 | [1994/14] | WO1993SE00303 | Priority number, date | US19920868038 | 13.04.1992 Original published format: US 868038 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9321699 | Date: | 28.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590135 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590135 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04Q7/20, H04J13/00 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
H04W52/283 (EP,US);
H04B7/216 (KR);
H04B7/2628 (EP,US);
H04J13/00 (EP,US);
H04W16/00 (EP,US);
H04W52/50 (EP,US);
H04W16/32 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,US);
H04W28/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/14] | H04B7/26, H04Q7/04, H04J13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | CDMA FREQUENZZUORDNUNG | [1994/14] | English: | CDMA FREQUENCY ALLOCATION | [1994/14] | French: | ATTRIBUTION DE FREQUENCE D'ACCES MULTIPLES PAR DIFFERENCE DE CODE | [1994/14] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99119548.8 / EP0967741 | EP99119549.6 / EP0971489 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.04.2002 | [2005/10] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4134071 (OHNSORGE HORST); | [A]EP0470831 (AGT LTD [CA]); | [A]US5101501 (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US], et al) | by applicant | US5151919 | US5187675 | US5218619 | US5353352 | US5357454 |