Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.06.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] |
06.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] |
14.03.1997 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] |
05.03.1997 | Renewal fee | |
16.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
11.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
24.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant | |
06.03.1996 | Renewal fee | |
20.04.1995 | First examination report | |
16.12.1994 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] |
16.12.1994 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] |