Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9316474 | Global Dossier | 19.08.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83335092 | 10.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07506925 | Global Dossier | 27.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US87028392 | 17.04.1992 | US9302690 | 25.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3364220B | Global Dossier | 08.01.2003 | B2 | JPH07503805 | 20.04.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9300563 | 22.01.1993 | US83335092 | 10.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0627115 | Global Dossier | 23.08.1995 | B1 | EP0627115 | 07.12.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9300563 | 22.01.1993 | US83335092 | 10.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0636270 | Global Dossier | 02.05.1997 | B1 | EP0636270 | 01.02.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87028392 | 17.04.1992 | US9302690 | 25.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1032670C | 28.08.1996 | C | CN1076299 | 15.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US83335092 | 10.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69300401T | 04.04.1996 | T2 | DE69300401D1 | 28.09.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9300563 | 22.01.1993 | US83335092 | 10.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69310359T | 06.11.1997 | T2 | DE69310359D1 | 05.06.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US87028392 | 17.04.1992 | US9302690 | 25.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0627115T | 18.09.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US83335092 | 10.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2076058T | 16.10.1995 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US83335092 | 10.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR950700591 | 16.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9300563 | 22.01.1993 | US83335092 | 10.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR950701123 | 20.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US87028392 | 17.04.1992 | US9302690 | 25.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO943897L | 15.04.1996 | L | NO943897D0 | 14.10.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US87028392 | 17.04.1992 | US9302690 | 25.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5261626 | 16.11.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US87028392 | 17.04.1992 | US83335092 | 10.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5303875 | 19.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US83335092 | 10.02.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9321634 | Global Dossier | 28.10.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87028392 | 17.04.1992 |