EP0636051 - APPARATUS COMPRISING A WATER IONIZING ELECTRODE AND PROCESS OF USE OF SAID APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/05] | WATER IONIZING ELECTRODE AND PROCESS FOR USING | ||
[1997/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLIN CORPORATION 350 Knotter Drive P.O. Box 586 Cheshire, CT 06410-0586 / US | [1995/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAWLFIELD, David, W. 226 Westbrook Circle Cleveland, TN 37312 / US | 02 /
KACZUR, Jerry, J. 3267 Terrace Avenue Cleveland, TN 37312 / US | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Baker, Colin John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | Baker, Colin John, et al Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1995/05] | Badcock, Michèle Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93909176.5 | 26.03.1993 | [1995/05] | WO1993US02825 | Priority number, date | US19920867557 | 13.04.1992 Original published format: US 867557 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9320929 | Date: | 28.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636051 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0636051 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/44 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
B01D61/445 (EP,US);
B01D61/52 (EP,US);
C01D1/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/05] | B01D63/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/05] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT WASSERIONISIERENDEN ELEKTRODEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEREN VERWENDUNG | [1997/17] | English: | APPARATUS COMPRISING A WATER IONIZING ELECTRODE AND PROCESS OF USE OF SAID APPARATUS | [1997/17] | French: | APPAREIL COMPRENANT UNE ELECTRODE DE IONISATION D'EAU ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DU DIT APPAREIL | [1997/17] |
Former [1995/05] | WASSERIONISIERENDE ELEKTRODE UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEREN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [1995/05] | WATER IONIZING ELECTRODE AND PROCESS FOR USING | ||
Former [1995/05] | ELECTRODE D'IONISATION D'EAU ET PROCEDE D'UTILISATION DE LADITE ELECTRODE | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1994 | Search fee paid | 24.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 19.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.04.1997 | [2002/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4159367 (BERCHIELLI ALDO S [US], et al) [A] 1 * SEE ESPECIALLY COLUMN 5, EXAMPLE 1 *; | [A]FR1604064 (THOMSON-CSF) [A] 9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4238305 (GANCY ALAN B [US], et al); | [A]US4969983 (PARSI EDGARDO J [US]); | [XY]US4732660 (PLOWMAN KEITH R [US], et al); | [Y]US4931168 (WATANABE MASAHIRO [JP], et al) |