Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0591554
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
19.09.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] |
27.09.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] |
11.09.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.05.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.05.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.04.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.01.1995 |
First examination report |
|
16.08.1994 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] |
04.08.1994 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] |
25.02.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] |
25.02.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] |