EP0591554 - ACCELERATION SENSOR AND ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/15] | For all designated states NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD. 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Tetsuo Nippondenso Co. Ltd., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City, Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | [1994/15] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1994/15] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 93909418.1 | 23.04.1993 | [1994/15] | WO1993JP00535 | Priority number, date | JP19920108020 | 27.04.1992 Original published format: JP 10802092 | [1994/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322690 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0591554 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0591554 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/125, G01P15/08 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
G01P15/125 (EP,US);
G01P15/0802 (EP,US);
G01P2015/0817 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/15] | G01P15/125 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1994/15] | Title | German: | BESCHLEUNIGUNGSSENSOR UND SEINE HERSTELLUNG | [1994/15] | English: | ACCELERATION SENSOR AND ITS MANUFACTURE | [1994/15] | French: | CAPTEUR D'ACCELERATION ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1994/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1993 | Translation filed | 27.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1993 | Search fee paid | 27.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 12.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS60244864 (BECTON DICKINSON CO); | [A]JPS6173071 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPS6227666 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC); | [A]JPS62207917 (FUJITSU LTD) | Examination | US4679434 |