EP0636132 - SUBSTITUTED NITROGEN CONTAINING SPIRO COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN TREATING COGNITIVE DEFICITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states THE DU PONT MERCK PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABELMAN, Matthew Mark 873 Stevens Avenue, Apartment 3312 Solano Beach, CA 92075 / US | 02 /
BRITTELLI, David, Ross 90 Hopewell Road Nottingham, PA 19362-9603 / US | 03 /
NUGIEL, David, Alan 643 Addison Street Philadelphia, PA 19147 / US | 04 /
VOSS, Matthew, Ernst 8 West View Drive Lincoln University, PA 19352 / US | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1995/05] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93909506.3 | 15.04.1993 | [1995/05] | WO1993US03391 | Priority number, date | US19920869163 | 16.04.1992 Original published format: US 869163 | [1995/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9321185 | Date: | 28.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636132 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/10, C07D401/14, A61K31/395, C07D241/38 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
C07D241/38 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D471/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/05] | Title | German: | SUSTITUIERTE STICKSTOFF ENTHALTENDE SPIRO VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KOGNITIVEN STÖRUNGEN | [1995/05] | English: | SUBSTITUTED NITROGEN CONTAINING SPIRO COMPOUNDS FOR USE IN TREATING COGNITIVE DEFICITS | [1995/05] | French: | COMPOSES SPIRO CONTENANT DE L'AZOTE SUBSTITUE UTILISES POUR TRAITER DES DEFICITS COGNITIFS | [1995/05] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/05] | 01.02.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0311010 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]US4760083 (MYERS MELVYN J [US], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, 1977, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 43538z, PROSTAKOV, N. S. ET AL. 'Formation of spiran structure ...' |