|
28.02.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2002 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2002 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.2001 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.05.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2000 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.01.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
13.10.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1998 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.12.1997 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.06.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.08.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.02.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.1996 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.1996 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.11.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
10.11.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.04.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.02.1995 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1995 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.10.1994 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.1994 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.10.1994 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.1994 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.1994 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.12.1993 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
23.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |