Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2882682B | Global Dossier | 12.04.1999 | B2 | JPH07507497 | 24.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU663383B | Global Dossier | 05.10.1995 | B2 | AU4055093 | 04.01.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0646053 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2002 | B2 | EP0646053 | 11.09.1996 | B1 | EP0646053 | 05.04.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9306556 | 12.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2138155 | 23.09.2003 | C | CA2138155 | 23.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69304703T | 21.11.2002 | T3 | DE69304703T | 30.04.1997 | T2 | DE69304703D1 | 17.10.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI101945B | 30.09.1998 | B1 | FI101945B | 30.09.1998 | B | FI945888 | 14.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100248844B | 01.04.2000 | B1 | KR950701851 | 17.05.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL173289B | 27.02.1998 | B1 | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RO115607 | 28.04.2000 | B1 | Priority number | Date | BE9329275 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2102185 | 20.01.1998 | C1 | RU94046285 | 20.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK155094 | 04.02.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA27917 | 16.10.2000 | C2 | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5695674 | 09.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9300029 | 27.05.1993 | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9325334 | Global Dossier | 23.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE142546T | 15.09.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE1005987 | 12.04.1994 | A3 | Priority number | Date | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ316394 | 13.09.1995 | A3 | Priority number | Date | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2090994T | 01.11.2002 | T5 | ES2090994T | 16.10.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR27139 | 09.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA933907 | 30.12.1993 | B | Priority number | Date | BE9200555 | 16.06.1992 |