Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | Lapse: 31.05.1999 | DE | | ES | | FR | | GB | | IT | | LU | | NL | | SE | | Examination procedure | 15.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | | 21.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 21.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | European patent granted | 11.09.1996 | Opposition procedure | 10.01.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 05.04.1995 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE | | Event date: | 11.09.1996 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE | | Event date: | 27.03.2002 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE | | Event date: | 05.04.1995 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19941121 | | Event date: | 31.05.1995 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19950419 | | Event date: | 11.09.1996 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 142546 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19960915 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 17.10.1996 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69304703 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19961017 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 06.12.1996 | | Event description: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | | Event date: | 06.11.1996 | | Event description: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 19961016 | | Event date: | 16.10.1996 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2090994 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 16.11.1996 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2090994 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 01.01.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Event date: | 06.08.1997 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | STOPINC AG | Effective DATE: | 19970606 | | Event date: | 01.10.1997 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | STOPINC AG | | Event date: | 30.11.1999 | | Event description: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | S.A. INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING | Effective DATE: | 19990531 | | Event date: | 02.10.2000 | | Event description: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | STOPINC AG | | Event date: | 18.04.2001 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | VESUVIUS GROUP S.A | | Event date: | 01.06.2001 | | Event description: | NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN | OWNER: | VESUVIUS GROUP S.A | | Event date: | 27.03.2002 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Effective DATE: | 20020327 | | Event date: | 03.06.2002 | | Event description: | NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION | | Event date: | 24.07.2002 | | Event description: | GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977) | | Event date: | 02.09.2002 | | Event description: | NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE | | Event date: | 01.11.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES DC2A T5 | Code Expl.: | PATENT MODIFIED | Effective DATE: | 20020618 | | Event date: | 16.08.2000 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | STOPINC AG | Effective DATE: | 19970606 | | Event date: | 02.09.2002 | | Event description: | NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE) | Free Format Text: | PAT. BUL. 11/96, PAGE 1564: CORR.: VESUVIUS GROUP S.A. | | Event date: | 02.06.2003 | | Event description: | NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION | Effective DATE: | 20020327 | | Event date: | 25.01.2006 | | Event description: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20050527 | | Event date: | 01.02.2006 | | Event description: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20051201 | | Event date: | 17.01.2006 | | Event description: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 10.03.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20060131 | | Event date: | 16.08.2006 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20050528 | | Event date: | 31.05.1999 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990531 | | Event date: | 01.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20051201 | | Event date: | 28.05.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20050528 | | Event date: | 31.01.2006 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20060131 | | Event date: | 27.05.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20050527 | | Event date: | 27.05.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20050527 | | Event date: | 01.12.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20051201 | | Event date: | 28.05.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20050528 | | Event date: | 04.05.2004 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20040504 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 16.04.1998 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 19980416 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Event date: | 19.05.2004 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20040519 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 19.05.2004 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20040519 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 28.05.2004 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20040528 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 29.04.2004 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20040429 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 21.05.2004 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20040521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 30.06.2004 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20040630 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 09.06.2004 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20040609 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 27.05.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20050527 | | Event date: | 27.05.2005 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20050527 | | Event date: | 08.02.2002 | | Event description: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009272 | | Event date: | 26.07.1996 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 23.05.1996 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 22.02.1996 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 17.02.1995 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 08.02.2002 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT MAINTAINED AS AMENDED | | Event date: | 12.10.2001 | | Event description: | INTERLOCUTORY DECISION IN OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IDOP | | Event date: | 18.05.2001 | | Event description: | INTERLOCUTORY DECISION IN OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IDOP | | Event date: | 30.06.2000 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 28.06.2000 | | Event description: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | | Event date: | 23.01.1998 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 15.07.1997 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 20.06.1997 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 18.06.1997 | | Event description: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | |