EP0646053 - CASTING FLOW CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LU | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESUVIUS GROUP S.A Avenue du Commerce, 40 1420 Braine-l'Alleud / BE | [2001/16] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING S.A. Chaussée de Nivelles 100 B-1420 Braine l'Alleud / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZADKOWSKI, Stanislav Route de Roule 37 CH-1723 Marly / CH | [1995/14] | Representative(s) | Plaçais, Jean Yves, et al Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Plaçais, Jean-Yves, et al Cabinet Netter, 40, rue Vignon 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1995/14] | De Palmenaer, Roger, et al Bureau Vander Haeghen S.A. Rue Colonel Bourg 108 A B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 93909704.4 | 27.05.1993 | [1995/14] | WO1993BE00029 | Priority number, date | BE19920000555 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: BE 9200555 | [1995/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9325334 | Date: | 23.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0646053 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646053 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/37] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0646053 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/24 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
B22D41/24 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1995/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFLUSSREGELUNG EINES FLÜSSIGEN METALLSTROMES | [1995/14] | English: | CASTING FLOW CONTROL DEVICE | [1995/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGULATION D'UN DEBIT DE COULEE | [1995/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.1997
30.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE Stopinc AG Zugerstr. 76a 6340 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Luchs, Willi c/o Stopinc Aktiengesellschaft Bösch 38a Postfach 745 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.1997
30.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE Stopinc AG Zugerstr. 76a 6340 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Luchs, Willi, Dipl.Ing. c/o Stopinc Aktiengesellschaft Bösch 83a P.O. Box 745 6331 Hüneberg / CH | ||
Former [1997/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.06.1997
30.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE Stopinc AG Zugerstr. 76a 6340 Baar / CH Opponent's representative Brückner, Raimund, Dipl.-Ing. Didier-Werke AG, Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 1 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | 18.07.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.01.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.05.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.06.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.01.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.05.1999 | [2015/21] |
Former [2007/16] | LU | 31.05.1997 | |
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | BE | 31.05.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2462952 (USS ENG & CONSULT [US]); | [A]BE896223 (VESUVIUS INTERNAT CORP); | [A]EP0202213 (VESUVIUS INT CORP [US]); | [A]WO8801211 (STOPINC AG [CH]) | Examination | DE2161368 | DE2746265 | DE4023984 | EP0441927 | WO9209390 |