EP0649365 - JOINING ELEMENT FOR DETACHABLY JOINING A TOOL TO A HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METAFORM METALLVERARBEITUNGSGESELLSCHAFT mbH Industriegebiet D-55768 Hoppstädten-Weiersbach / DE | [1995/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLTE, Werner Flurweg 2 D-6589 Nohen / DE | [1995/17] | Representative(s) | Lewald, Dietrich Vonnemann, Kloiber, Lewald, Hübner Belgradstrasse 1 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | Lewald, Dietrich, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93909863.8 | 29.04.1993 | [1995/17] | WO1993EP01041 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9425223 | Date: | 10.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0649365 | Date: | 26.04.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0649365 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B25G3/18, A46B5/00 | [1995/17] | CPC: |
B25G3/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/17] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT ZUR LÖSBAREN VERBINDUNG EINES ARBEITSGERÄTES MIT EINEM ARBEITSSTIEL | [1995/17] | English: | JOINING ELEMENT FOR DETACHABLY JOINING A TOOL TO A HANDLE | [1995/17] | French: | ELEMENT POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE DEMONTABLE D'UN OUTIL ET DE SON MANCHE | [1995/17] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 20.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1998 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.12.1998 | GB | 09.12.1998 | NL | 09.12.1998 | AT | 29.04.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | GB | 09.12.1998 | |
NL | 09.12.1998 | ||
AT | 29.04.1999 | ||
FR | 07.05.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | GB | 09.12.1998 | |
AT | 29.04.1999 | ||
FR | 07.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/22] | GB | 09.12.1998 | |
FR | 07.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 09.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9214064 (HARRAH) [X] 1-15,19 * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 2; figures 1-5; claims 12,13 * [Y] 17; | [Y]DE3234704 (DIETSCHE) [Y] 17 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0078358 (FREUDENBERG) [A] 1-16,19 * page 6, line 16 - page 8, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3229054 (DIETSCHE); | [A]GB2224231 (SHARP) | Examination | EP0234210 | EP0202362 |