EP0637983 - DEVICE AND METHOD TO SEPARATE THE COMPONENTS IN MIXTURES OF NON-MISCIBLE LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITALTRACO S.r.l. Via Terraggio, 17 20123 Milano / IT | [2000/14] |
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states ITALTRACO S.r.l. Via Terraggio, 17 I-20123 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORINI, Alberto P.zza Della Conciliazone, 5 I-20123 Milano / IT | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Faggioni, Marco, et al Fumero S.r.l. Pettenkoferstrasse 20/22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Faggioni, Marco, et al Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Snc Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/07] | Faggioni, Marco, Dr. Ing., et al c/o Fumero Studio Consulenza Brevetti Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93909872.9 | 30.04.1993 | [1995/07] | WO1993EP01053 | Priority number, date | IT1992MI01045 | 30.04.1992 Original published format: IT MI921045 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322023 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0637983 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0637983 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D17/022, B01D39/04 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
B01D39/04 (EP,US);
B01D17/08 (EP,US);
Y10S210/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1995/07] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRENNEN DER BESTANDTEILE VON GEMISCHEN NICHT DURCHEINANDER LÖSLICHEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [1995/07] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD TO SEPARATE THE COMPONENTS IN MIXTURES OF NON-MISCIBLE LIQUIDS | [1995/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE SEPARATION DES CONSTITUANTS DANS DES MELANGES DE LIQUIDES NON MISCIBLES | [1995/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/16] | LU | 05.06.2000 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR895586 ; | [A]US3925202 (HIRS GENE); | [A]US4061573 (BIRON RICHARD D); | [A]US4242207 (FORD GREGORY A [US]); | [Y]DE3644665 (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]WO8906567 (CHAININGS LTD [GB]) |