Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0637983
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
05.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
16.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
02.02.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
18.02.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] |
17.01.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.10.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.05.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.10.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.09.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.07.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.05.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.02.1996 |
First examination report |
|
30.12.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] |
30.12.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] |