EP0639971 - THERAPEUTIC COMBINATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | ||
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road London NW1 2BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARDER, Brendan, Alexander Langley Court Beckenham Kent BR3 3BS / GB | 02 /
SYMONS, Sharon, Dawn Langley Court Beckenham Kent BR3 3BS / GB | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Garrett, Michael, et al Glaxo Wellcome plc, Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Garrett, Michael, et al The Wellcome Foundation Limited Group Patents and Agreements Langley Court Beckenham Kent BR3 3BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93910190.3 | 13.05.1993 | [1995/09] | WO1993GB00980 | Priority number, date | GB19920010256 | 13.05.1992 Original published format: GB 9210256 | GB19930007013 | 02.04.1993 Original published format: GB 9307013 | [1995/19] |
Former [1995/09] | GB19920010256 | 13.05.1992 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9323021 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639971 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639971 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/55, A61K31/44, A61K31/505 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (EP);
A61K31/495 (EP);
A61K31/496 (EP);
A61K31/505 (EP);
A61K31/513 (EP);
A61K31/517 (EP);
A61K31/55 (EP);
A61K31/5513 (EP);
A61K31/5517 (EP);
A61K31/7068 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5513, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5517, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7068, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/70, A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/70, A61K31/495 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE KOMBINATIONEN | [1995/09] | English: | THERAPEUTIC COMBINATIONS | [1995/09] | French: | COMBINAISONS THERAPEUTIQUES | [1995/09] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0291633 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [A]EP0336466 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [A]EP0384522 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [X]WO9109849 (UPJOHN CO [US]); | [X]EP0462800 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [A]WO9200979 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE]); | [XP]WO9214743 (UNIV EMORY [US]); | [XP]EP0513917 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]); | [XP]EP0530994 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [X]EP0382526 (IAF BIOCHEM INT [CA]) | [X] - MOL.PHARMACOL. vol. 41, no. 3, March 1992, pages 446 - 451 J.W.MELLORS ET AL. 'IN VITRO SELECTION AND MOLECULAR CHARACTERIZATION...' | [X] - ANTIMICROB.AGENTS CHEMOTHER. vol. 35, no. 2, February 1991, pages 305 - 308 D.RICHMAN ET AL. 'BI-RG-587 IS ACTIVE AGAINST ZIDOVUDINE-RESISTANT HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS...' | [X] - PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI.USA vol. 88, August 1991, pages 6863 - 6867 M.E.GOLDMAN ET AL. 'PYTIDINONE DERIVATIVES...' | [X] - PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI.USA vol. 88, no. 21, 1 November 1991, pages 9878 - 9882 C.-K. SHIH ET AL. 'CHIMERIC HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENY...' | [X] - PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI.USA vol. 88, October 1991, pages 8806 - 8810 D.L.ROMERO ET AL. 'NONNUCLEOSIDE REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE INHIBITORS...' | [X] - PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI.USA vol. 88, March 1991, pages 2356 - 2360 M.BABA ET AL. 'POTENT AND SELECTIVE INHIBITION...' | [X] - BEHRING INST.MITT. vol. 89, July 1991, pages 74 - 80 L.BIESERT ET AL. 'BIOCHEMICAL AND GENETICAL ANALYSIS...' | [X] - J.VIROL. vol. 65, no. 9, September 1991, pages 4887 - 4892 J.H.NUNBERG 'VIRAL RESISTANCE...' | [X] - ANTIVIRAL RES. vol. 17, no. SUP, March 1992, page 46 R.W.BUCKHEIT ET AL. 'COMBINATIONS OF AZT AND ANALOGS OF TIBO ACT SYNERGISTICALLY TO INHIBIT HIV-1 INFECTION IN VIVO.' | [X] - ANTIMICROB.AGENTS CHEMOTHER. vol. 36, no. 12, December 1992, pages 2664 - 2669 B.A.LARDER '3'-AZIDO-3'-DEOXYTHYMIDINE RESISTANCE...' | [XP] - VIROLOGY vol. 188, no. 2, June 1992, pages 900 - 904 K.DE VREESE ET AL. 'RESISTANCE OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS...' | [A] - NATURE vol. 343, 1 February 1990, pages 470 - 474 R.PAUWELS ET AL. 'POTENT AND SELECTIVE INHIBITION...' cited in the application | [X] - AIDS RES.HUM.RETROVIRUSES vol. 8, no. 2, February 1992, pages 119 - 134 E.DE CLERCQ 'HIV INHIBITORS TARGETED AT THE REVERSE TRANSCRIPTASE' | [X] - PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI.USA vol. 88, no. 24, 15 December 1991, pages 11241 - 11245 D.RICHMAN ET AL. 'HUMAN UMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 MUTANTS..' | [XP] - MOL.PHARMACOL. vol. 43, no. 1, January 1993, pages 11 - 16 J.W.MELLORS ET AL. 'A SINGLE CONSERVATIVE AMINO ACID SUBSTITUTION...' | [A] - SCIENCE vol. 253, 27 September 1991, pages 1557 - 1559 M.H.ST.CLAIR ET AL. 'RESISTANCE TO DDI AND SENSITIVITY TO AZT...' | Examination | - LARDER ET AL: "Potential Mechanism for sustained antiretroviral potency of AZT/3TC combination therapy.". Science 1995,,,vol. 269, no., pages 696 to 699 | - NIJHUIS ET AL: "Lamivudine Resistant Human Immunodeficiency Virus. ", J. INFECT.DIS. 1997,,,vol. 176, no.,pages 398 to 405 | - JOHNSON ET AL: "Drug Resistance, viral load and SI phenotype in NUCA 3002", ANTIVIRAL THERAPY 1996, vol. 1, no. 1, pp. 36-37 |