EP0641511 - LIGHTING ARRANGEMENT WITH VARIABLE LUMINOUS INTENSITY AND COLOUR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEGALUX FENYTECHNIKAI KFT. Vaci ut 40 H-1044 Budapest / HU | [1995/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LADANYI, J(RTM)zsef Nyéki u. 1 H-1021 Budapest / HU | [1998/46] |
Former [1998/34] | 01 /
LAD NYI, J(RTM)zsef Nyéki u. 1 H-1021 Budapest / HU | ||
Former [1995/10] | 01 /
LAD NYI, József Nyéki u. 1 H-1021 Budapest / HU | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/10] | Patentanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93910301.6 | 20.05.1993 | [1995/10] | WO1993HU00029 | Priority number, date | HU19920001682 | 20.05.1992 Original published format: HU 9201682 | [1998/34] |
Former [1998/33] | HU19920016829 | 20.05.1992 | |
Former [1995/10] | HU19160082992 | 20.05.1992 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323977 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641511 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641511 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/36, H05B41/00 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
H05B41/3921 (EP,US);
H05B47/19 (US);
H05B47/195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1995/10] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT VERÄNDERBARER LICHTSTÄRKE UND FARBE | [1995/10] | English: | LIGHTING ARRANGEMENT WITH VARIABLE LUMINOUS INTENSITY AND COLOUR | [1995/10] | French: | INSTALLATION D'ECLAIRAGE AVEC LUMINOSITE ET INTENSITE DE TON MODULABLES | [1995/10] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 09.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]GB2045018 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [YA]US4523128 (STAMM THOMAS A [US], et al); | [A]US4523129 (PITEL IRA J [US]); | [A]DE3713041 (CHOW SHING CHEUNG); | [YA]HU201439 (LADANYI JOZSEF, et al) |