EP0639141 - PACKAGING CONTAINER AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB Akerlund & Rausing Box 22 S-221 01 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states AB AKERLUND & RAUSING Box 22 S-221 00 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIDEBORN, Karl Magle Lilla Kyrkogatan 5 S-222 51 Lund / SE | 02 /
HAGELQVIST, Per Möllergatan 3 S-222 29 Lund / SE | 03 /
LÜGNER, Anders Möllevangsgatan 33F S-214 20 Malmö / SE | 04 /
HOLMBERG, Yngve Spannmälsgatan 14 S-268 00 Svalöv / SE | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Albihn West AB, P.O. Box 142 S-401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 93910498.0 | 15.04.1993 | [1995/08] | WO1993SE00326 | Priority number, date | SE19920001509 | 11.05.1992 Original published format: SE 9201509 | [1995/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323297 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639141 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/56, B65D85/74, B31B7/60 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
B65D5/60 (EP);
B31B50/64 (EP,US);
B29C51/162 (EP);
B65D25/36 (EP);
B31B2105/00 (EP);
B31B2120/406 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSBEHÄLTER UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1995/08] | English: | PACKAGING CONTAINER AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [1995/08] | French: | BOITE D'EMBALLAGE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1995/08] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 03.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/09] | 04.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.06.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [P]SE9100905 ; | [A]US3445050 (PETERS ARTUR, et al); | [A]SE313274 (AKERLUND & RAUSING AB [SE]); | [X]SE350943 (ESSELTEPACK AB [SE]); | [X]SE353876 (JEPPSSON AB T); | [A]DK132582B (UNILEVER NV [NL]) |