EP0641485 - MEMBRANE DIELECTRIC ISOLATION IC FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEEDY, Glenn J. 1061 E. Mountain Drive Santa Barbara, CA 93108 / US | [1995/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93910567.2 | 02.04.1993 | [1995/10] | WO1993US03140 | Priority number, date | US19920865412 | 08.04.1992 Original published format: US 865412 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9321748 | Date: | 28.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641485 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/306, H01L21/00, H01L21/66, H01L21/265, H01L21/76, H01L21/302, H01L21/465, H01L21/469, H01L21/02, H01L23/31, H01L23/522, H01L21/312, H01L21/84 | [1997/34] | CPC: |
H01L25/50 (EP,US);
H01L21/00 (KR);
G03F7/70658 (EP,US);
G11C29/006 (EP,US);
H01L21/762 (EP,US);
H01L21/76264 (EP,US);
H01L21/764 (EP,US);
H01L23/538 (EP,US);
H01L23/5381 (EP,US);
H01L23/5383 (EP,US);
H01L23/5386 (EP,US);
H01L23/5387 (EP,US);
H01L25/0652 (EP,US);
H01L25/0655 (EP,US);
G02F1/13452 (EP,US);
G02F1/136281 (EP,US);
H01L21/76289 (EP,US);
H01L21/8221 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0401 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0557 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13009 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US);
H01L27/0207 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0102 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01057 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1305 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15165 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15312 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US);
Y10S148/135 (EP,US);
Y10S438/928 (EP,US);
Y10S438/938 (EP,US);
Y10S438/942 (EP,US);
Y10S438/967 (EP,US);
Y10S438/977 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49128 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49162 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00011, H01L2224/80001 (US,EP);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2224/05552 (US,EP);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/10] | H01L21/306, H01L21/00, H01L21/66, H01L21/265, H01L21/76, H01L21/302, H01L21/465, H01L21/469, H01L21/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, SE [1995/10] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG INTEGRIERTER SCHALTUNGEN AUF EINER ISOLIERENDEN DIELEKTRIKMEMBRAN | [1995/10] | English: | MEMBRANE DIELECTRIC ISOLATION IC FABRICATION | [1995/10] | French: | FABRICATION DE CIRCUIT INTEGRE A PARTIR D'UNE MEMBRANE D'ISOLATION DIELECTRIQUE | [1995/10] | Entry into regional phase | 31.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 31.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 28.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/29] | 31.03.2004 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/29] | Appeal following examination | 08.02.2001 | Appeal received No. T0536/01 | 10.04.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 12.05.2004 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 12.05.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 31.03.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP02009643.4 / EP1233444 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.12.1994 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   31.12.1994 | 16.12.1994 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   31.12.1994 | 16.12.1994 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   31.12.1994 | 16.12.1994 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   31.12.1994 | 16.12.1994 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   31.12.1994 | 16.12.1994 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   31.12.1994 | 16.12.1994 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   31.12.1994 | 16.12.1994 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   31.12.1994 | 16.12.1994 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   31.12.1994 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.12.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   31.12.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3559282 (LESK ISRAEL A); | [A]US3602982 (KOOI ELSE); | [A]US3716429 (NAPOLI L, et al); | [A]US3777227 (KRISHNA S, et al); | [XY]US4070230 (STEIN KARL-ULRICH); | [XA]US4072982 (STEIN KARL-ULRICH); | [Y]US4539068 (TAKAGI MIKIO [JP], et al); | [X]EP0189976 (SOVONICS SOLAR SYSTEMS [US]); | [A]US4618397 (SHIMIZU ISAO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4702936 (MAEDA KAZUO [JP], et al); | [X]US4924589 (LEEDY GLENN J [US]); | [A]US4952446 (LEE KEVIN C [US], et al); | [AP]US5110373 (MAUGER PHILIP E [US]) | International search | [XY]US4070230 (STEIN KARL-ULRICH); | [XY]US4131985 (GREENWOOD JOHN C, et al); | [Y]US4539068 (TAKAGI MIKIO [JP], et al); | [A]US4618397 (SHIMIZU ISAO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4702936 (MAEDA KAZUO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4721938 (STEVENSON PAUL E [US]); | [X]US4924589 (LEEDY GLENN J [US]); | [A]US4952446 (LEE KEVIN C [US], et al); | [A]US5110373 (MAUGER PHILIP E [US]) |