EP0637962 - METHOD OF PREPARING A MULTIPHASE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESTEE LAUDER INC. 767 Fifth Avenue New York New York 10153 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states ESTEE LAUDER INC. 767 Fifth Avenue New York New York 10153 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAHANAS, Konstantinos M. 53 Union Street Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US | 02 /
KEELER, Tracy N. 40 Prospect Avenue Northport, NY 11768 / US | 03 /
BEVACQUA, Andrew J. 23 Caleb Brewster Road East Setauket, NY 11733 / US | 04 /
CIOCA, George 1 West Cliff Lane Lake Groove, NY 11755 / US | [1997/33] |
Former [1995/07] | 01 /
LAHANAS, Konstantinos, M. 53 Union Street Hackensack, NJ 07601 / US | ||
02 /
KEELER, Tracy, N. 40 Prospect Avenue Northport, NY 11768 / US | |||
03 /
BEVACQUA, Andrew, J. 23 Caleb Brewster Road East Setauket, NY 11733 / US | |||
04 /
CIOCA, George 1 West Cliff Lane Lake Groove, NY 11755 / US | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al CABINET WEINSTEIN 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93910857.7 | 28.04.1993 | [1995/07] | WO1993US03971 | Priority number, date | US19920874933 | 28.04.1992 Original published format: US 874933 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9321930 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0637962 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0637962 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/78, A61K31/785, B01J13/00, C09K19/36, A61K7/48, A61K7/00 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
B01J13/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/066 (EP,US);
A61K8/70 (EP,US);
A61K9/113 (EP,US);
A61K9/1274 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1995/07] | A61K31/78, A61K31/785, B01J13/00, C09K19/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRPHASENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1995/07] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING A MULTIPHASE COMPOSITION | [1995/07] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION MULTIPHASE | [1995/07] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 24.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 24.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 06.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2000 | BE | 05.01.2000 | ES | 05.01.2000 | GR | 05.01.2000 | NL | 05.01.2000 | SE | 05.01.2000 | DK | 05.04.2000 | PT | 05.04.2000 | IE | 28.04.2000 | LU | 28.04.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 28.04.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 28.04.2000 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 28.04.2000 | ||
MC | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 28.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 28.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 28.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
IE | 28.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]EP0076146 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]US4592934 (WOLSTONCROFT RICHARD L [US]); | [A]US4604281 (DECKNER GEORGE E [US], et al); | [A]US4720353 (BELL STEPHEN R [US]); | [A]US4803067 (BRUNETTA FABIO [IT], et al); | [A]US4859753 (GALLOT BERNARD [FR], et al); | [A]US4883659 (GOODMAN JACK J [US], et al); | [A]US4954332 (BISSETT DONALD L [US], et al); | [A]US4966205 (TANAKA YOSHINORI [JP]); | [A]US5015469 (YONEYAMA TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [A]US5061481 (SUZUKI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) |