EP0639276 - FACTORIAL CHEMICAL LIBRARIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Affymetrix, Inc. (a Delaware Corporation) 3380 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [1999/32] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Affymetrix, Inc. 3380 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states AFFYMAX TECHNOLOGIES N.V. De Ruyterkade 62 Willemstad, Curaçao / AN | ||
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states AFFYMAX TECHNOLOGIES N.V. De Ruyderkade 62 Curaçao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FODOR, Stephen, P., A. 3863 Nathan Way Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
STRYER, Lubert 843 Sonoma Terrace Stanford, CA 94305 / US | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | ||
Former [1995/08] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake & Co. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93910996.3 | 28.04.1993 | [1995/08] | WO1993US04145 | Priority number, date | US19920876792 | 29.04.1992 Original published format: US 876792 | [1995/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322684 | Date: | 11.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639276 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639276 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/543, C07K17/00, C12Q1/70, C12Q1/68 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
C40B30/04 (EP,US);
C07K1/047 (EP,US);
C07K1/06 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6874 (EP,US);
G01N33/6845 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00592 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00707 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6811 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/08] | Title | German: | FAKTORIELLE CHEMISCHE BIBLIOTHEKEN | [1995/08] | English: | FACTORIAL CHEMICAL LIBRARIES | [1995/08] | French: | BIBLIOTHEQUES CHIMIQUES FACTORIELLES | [1995/08] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 24.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03001316.3 / EP1324045 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Request for further processing for: | 09.01.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.2002 | Decision despatched | 21.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 16.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.08.1999 | Decision despatched | 31.10.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 31.10.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 05.12.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4631211 (HOUGHTEN RICHARD A [US]) [Y] 1-17; | [PY]WO9209300 (ITEREX PHARMA LP [US]) [PY] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO9306121 (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL]) [PY] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9200091 (BIOLIGAND INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [DY] - R.A.HOUGHTON ET AL., "Generation and Use of Synthetic Peptide Combinatorial Libraries for Basic Research and Drug Discovery.", NATURE, (19911107), vol. 354, doi:doi:10.1038/354084a0, pages 84 - 86, XP002245652 [DY] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/354084a0 | [DY] - K.S.LAM ET AL., "A New Type of Synthetic Peptide Library for Identifying Ligand-Binding Activity.", NATURE, (19911107), vol. 354, doi:doi:10.1038/354082a0, pages 82 - 84, XP000371736 [DY] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/354082a0 | [DY] - A.FURKA ET AL., "General method for Rapid Synthesis of Multicomponent Peptide Mixtures.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE AND PROTEIN RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 37, no. 6, pages 487 - 493 [DY] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO8600991 (COMMW SERUM LAB COMMISSION [AU]) | [XP] - BioTechniques, Vol. 13, No. 6, issued December 1992, PINILLA et al., "Rapid Identification of High Affinity Peptide Ligands Using Positional Scanning Synthetic Peptide Combinatorial Libraries", pages 901-905, see entire article. | [Y] - European Federation for Medicinal Chemistry Xth International Symposium on Medicinal Chemistry Abstracts, published 1988, FURKA et al., "More Peptides by Less Labour", p-168, see entire Abstract. | [Y] - Science, Vol. 251, issued 15 February 1991, FODOR et al., "Light-Directed, Spatially Addressable Parallel Chemical Synthesis", pages 767-778, see entire article. |